RADABAUGH v. CLAY TURNER REALTY GROUP LLC
Plaintiff: Shirley Radabaugh
Defendant: Clay Turner Realty Group LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00058
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/14/2020; Discovery due by 10/5/2020; Motions due by 11/5/2020; Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 8/3/2020; Expert Witness Report (Defendant) due by 9/3/2020; and Joint Status Report due by 10/5/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 06/19/2020. (jlh)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 6/18/2020. (cjc)
June 18, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Richard Liebowitz Receipt Number AGASDC-2864913, Fee Amount $200. (pts)
June 18, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Richard Liebowitz Receipt Number AGASDC-2864913, Fee Amount $200, by Shirley Radabaugh. Responses due by 7/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Richard Liebowitz)(Carson, Dorsey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/18/2020: #2 Flattened PDF) (pts).
June 17, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Hearing by telephone: Status Conference by telephone set for 6/18/2020 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps. Please dial 877-336-1829, enter code 5508163 and enter password 0058 to access the teleconference.(cjc)
June 8, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (thb)
June 8, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (thb)
June 8, 2020 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Jones, Kristen)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER directing parties conduct and file a joint 26(f) Report on or before 06/15/2020. The Court directs the Clerk to attach the standard "Rule 26(f) Report" to this Order, to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff's counsel at Liebowitz Law Firm, PLLC, 11 Sunrise Plaza, Suite 305, Valley Stream, NY 11580, and to email a courtesy copy of this Order to Plaintiff's law firm at rl@liebowitzlawfirm.com. Plaintiff's counsel shall, without delay, make arrangements for admission to the Court. Rule 26 Report due by 6/15/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 06/08/2020. (Attachments: #1 Rule 26(f) Report) (thb)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 05/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Blank forms for new civil case filings) (thb)
May 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kristen Amanda Turner. (Turner, Kristen)
May 15, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Clay Turner Realty Group LLC.(Turner, Kristen)
May 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 5/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel, #2 Pro Hac Vice Application)(thb)
April 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Deficiency re Attorney Admissions Status. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 5/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 PHV Forms)(pts)
April 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Transfer. (pts)
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 Case transfer in from District of Georgia Middle; Case Number 3:20-cv-00051. Case transferred electronically
April 22, 2020 Case Electronically Transferred Out - District Transfer to Southern District of Georgia, Augusta Division. All documents, including a certified copy of the docket sheet and pleading were transferred electronically. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**Case Transfer Acknowledgment deadline 5/6/2020. (ggs)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF TRANSFER transferring proceedings to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Georgia. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 4/22/2020. (ggs)
April 22, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by Shirley Radabaugh ); Generic descriptions of exhibits (i.e. Exhibit A, etc.) are not permitted. Exhibits must include a description. NO NEED TO REFILE, for future reference only - descriptions added by case manger for this filing.(ggs)
April 22, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RICHARD LIEBOWITZ - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (ggs)
April 22, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by Shirley Radabaugh ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. NO NEED TO REFILE. (ggs)
April 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Clay Turner Realty Group, LLC Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3447445, $400 filed by Shirley Radabaugh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Photograph, #2 Exhibit B - Clay Turner Realty Group, LLC Webpage, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(LIEBOWITZ, RICHARD) Modified on 4/22/2020 to include description of exhibits. (ggs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RADABAUGH v. CLAY TURNER REALTY GROUP LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clay Turner Realty Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Radabaugh
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?