Evans v. Roundtree
Petitioner: Quint L. Evans
Respondent: Sheriff Richard Roundtree
Case Number: 1:2020cv00061
Filed: April 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 6/19/2020. (pts)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ADOPTING #5 Report and Recommendations, and dismissing the petition filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 without prejudice. The Court denies COA in this case and ifp status on appeal. This case stands closed. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 6/19/2020. (pts)
June 4, 2020 Filing 7 OBJECTION to #5 Report and Recommendations by Quint L. Evans. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope)(slt)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing service of #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 05/22/2020. (maa)
May 22, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that this case be DISMISSED without prejudice and CLOSED. Objections to R&R due by 6/8/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 05/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3) (maa)
May 18, 2020 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number BWK009446. (csr)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. PLRA due by 5/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 04/29/2020. (maa)
April 29, 2020 Filing 3 Inmate Account Statement by Quint L. Evans. (maa)
April 29, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Quint L. Evans. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(maa)
April 29, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Quint L. Evans.(maa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Roundtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Quint L. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sheriff Richard Roundtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?