CKJ Investments, LLC et al v. Millar et al
Plaintiff: Sibley Mill Phase I Landlord, LLC, Augusta Cyberworks, LLC, Sibley Founders, LLC, Cape Augusta Digital Properties, LLC, Sibley Mill Manager, LLC, Augusta Cyberworks 2, LLC, Cape Augusta, LLC and CKJ Investments, LLC
Defendant: M-Communications, LLC, Eric Eshelman, James Ainslie, Wayne Millar and Millar
Case Number: 1:2020cv00075
Filed: May 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER nunc pro tunc granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Augusta Cyberworks 2, LLC answer due 8/31/2020; Augusta Cyberworks, LLC answer due 8/31/2020; Cape Augusta Digital Properties, LLC answer due 8/31/2020; Cape Augusta, LLC answer due 8/31/2020; M-Communications, LLC answer due 8/31/2020; Wayne Millar answer due 8/31/2020; Sibley Founders, LLC answer due 8/31/2020; Sibley Mill Manager, LLC answer due 8/31/2020; and Sibley Mill Phase I Landlord, LLC answer due 8/31/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 07/14/2020. (jlh)
July 14, 2020 MOTION REFERRED: #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (jlh)
July 13, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Augusta Cyberworks 2, LLC. Responses due by 7/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tisdale, J.)
July 13, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Andrew Tisdale on behalf of All Defendants (Tisdale, J.)
July 2, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Eric Eshelman answer due 7/17/2020. (pts)
July 2, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CKJ Investments, LLC. Eric Eshelman served on 6/25/2020, answer due 7/16/2020. (Emas, Samuel)
June 24, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CKJ Investments, LLC. James Ainslie served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020; Augusta Cyberworks 2, LLC served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020; Augusta Cyberworks, LLC served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020; Cape Augusta Digital Properties, LLC served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020; Cape Augusta, LLC served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020; M-Communications, LLC served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020; Millar served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020; Wayne Millar served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020; Sibley Founders, LLC served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020; Sibley Mill Manager, LLC served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020; Sibley Mill Phase I Landlord, LLC served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons served- Augusta Cyberworks 2 LLC, #2 Summons served- Augusta Cyberworks LLC, #3 Summons served- Cape Augusta Digital Properties, #4 Summons served- James Anslie, #5 Summons served- M-Communications, #6 Summons served- Sibley Founders LLC, #7 Summons served- Sibley Mill Manager LLC, #8 Summons served- Sibley Mill Phase I Landlord)(Emas, Samuel)
June 17, 2020 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to James Ainslie, Augusta Cyberworks 2, LLC, Augusta Cyberworks, LLC, Cape Augusta Digital Properties, LLC, Eric Eshelman, M-Communications, LLC, Wayne Millar, Sibley Founders, LLC, Sibley Mill Manager, LLC, Sibley Mill Phase I Landlord, LLC. (jlh)
June 16, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Submitted (Emas, Samuel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2020: #1 Corrected Main Document) (jlh).
June 16, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Submitted (Emas, Samuel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2020: #1 Corrected Main Document) (jlh).
June 16, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Submitted (Emas, Samuel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2020: #1 Corrected Main Document) (jlh).
June 16, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Submitted (Emas, Samuel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2020: #1 Corrected Main Document) (jlh).
June 16, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Submitted (Emas, Samuel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2020: #1 Corrected Main Document) (jlh).
June 16, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Submitted (Emas, Samuel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2020: #1 Corrected Main Document) (jlh).
June 16, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Submitted (Emas, Samuel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2020: #1 Corrected Main Document) (jlh).
June 16, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Submitted (Emas, Samuel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2020: #1 Corrected Main Document) (jlh).
June 16, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Submitted (Emas, Samuel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2020: #1 Corrected Main Document) (jlh).
June 16, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Submitted (Emas, Samuel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2020: #1 Corrected Main Document) (jlh).
June 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel A. Emas on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Emas, Samuel)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 06/01/2020. (Attachments: #1 Blank Forms.) (jlh)
May 31, 2020 Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number AGASDC-2852541. (jlh) Modified on 6/1/2020 (jlh).
May 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all Defendants, filed by Sibley Founders, LLC, Augusta Cyberworks, LLC, CKJ Investments, LLC, Sibley Mill Phase I Landlord, LLC, Cape Augusta, LLC, Augusta Cyberworks 2, LLC, Sibley Mill Manager, LLC, Cape Augusta Digital Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, and #16 Exhibit N.) (jlh) Modified on 6/1/2020 (jlh). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/1/2020: #17 Corrected Civil Cover Sheet) (jlh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CKJ Investments, LLC et al v. Millar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M-Communications, LLC
Represented By: J. Andrew Tisdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Eshelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Ainslie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Millar
Represented By: J. Andrew Tisdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millar
Represented By: J. Andrew Tisdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sibley Mill Phase I Landlord, LLC
Represented By: Joseph T. Rhodes
Represented By: Samuel A. Emas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Augusta Cyberworks, LLC
Represented By: Joseph T. Rhodes
Represented By: Samuel A. Emas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sibley Founders, LLC
Represented By: Joseph T. Rhodes
Represented By: Samuel A. Emas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cape Augusta Digital Properties, LLC
Represented By: Joseph T. Rhodes
Represented By: Samuel A. Emas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sibley Mill Manager, LLC
Represented By: Joseph T. Rhodes
Represented By: Samuel A. Emas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Augusta Cyberworks 2, LLC
Represented By: Joseph T. Rhodes
Represented By: Samuel A. Emas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cape Augusta, LLC
Represented By: Joseph T. Rhodes
Represented By: Samuel A. Emas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CKJ Investments, LLC
Represented By: Joseph T. Rhodes
Represented By: Samuel A. Emas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?