Ealey v. Van Tassel et al
Plaintiff: Johnny F. Ealey
Defendant: Winsay, Inc., Jacob A. Van Tassel, James E. Hester, Nationwide Insurance Co., Central Mutual Insurance Co. and Chris Landrum
Case Number: 1:2020cv00083
Filed: June 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER finding as moot #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Out of an abundance of caution, the Court directs the Clerk to serve a copy of this Order, along with a Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement on Plaintiffs custodian. PLRA due by 8/28/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 08/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 PLRA Forms.) (jlh)
August 6, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Johnny F. Ealey. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(thb)
July 15, 2020 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Return to Sender/No Such Person at this Address. Mail re #4 Order sent to Johnny F. Ealey. (jlh) Modified on 7/15/2020 (jlh).
July 14, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: PLRA due by 8/7/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 8/7/2020. (pts)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing the Clerk to re-serve #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on Plaintiff. Further, the Court Vacates #3 Rule 26(f) Order. Finally, the Court extends the PLRA deadline to 8/7/2020, and directs Plaintiff to amend his complaint using the standard form by 8/7/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 7/14/2020. (pts)
July 7, 2020 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Johnny F. Ealey re #3 : Return To Sender. Attempted- Not Known. Unable To Forward. (MG)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff must return both the Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement and the Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account to the Clerk within thirty days of this Order. PLRA due by 7/23/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 06/23/2020. (maa)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ***VACATED*** RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 06/15/2020. (maa) Modified on 7/14/2020 (pts).
June 15, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Johnny F. Ealey. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(maa)
June 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Johnny F. Ealey. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Complaint, #2 Letter, #3 Envelope)(maa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ealey v. Van Tassel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winsay, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob A. Van Tassel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Hester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Mutual Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Landrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny F. Ealey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?