Saha v. Saha
Plaintiff: Anuj K. Saha
Defendant: Asit B. Saha
Case Number: 1:2020cv00101
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Anuj K. Saha (Butler, Jeffrey)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #3 Notice. Plaintiff's counsel shall file a notice of appearance or notify the Court of Plaintiff's intentions (Compliance due by 8/12/2020.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 8/6/2020. (pts)
July 20, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Asit B. Saha answer due 8/9/2020. Compliance re Notice of Appearance due by 7/30/2020. Amended Pleadings to re-file any pending motions due by 8/3/2020. (jlh)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 REMOVAL NOTICE to all Counsel of Record re #1 Notice of Removal. (jlh)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 07/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Blank Civil Case Forms.) (jlh)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of Richmond Court, case number 2020RCCV00240, filed by Asit B. Saha. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGASDC-2883757.) (Attachments: #1 Summons, Complaint, Standing Order, and Affidavit of Proof of Service, #2 Notice of Removal, and #3 Civil Cover Sheet.) (jlh) Modified on 7/20/2020 (jlh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saha v. Saha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asit B. Saha
Represented By: Sonja R. Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anuj K. Saha
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?