Clark v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Shirley A. Clark
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv00107
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Augusta Office
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Prudential Insurance Company of America identifying Prudential Financial, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (Hebert, Shelley)
September 24, 2020 Filing 9 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint And Affirmative and Additional Defenses to Plaintiffs Complaint by The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Hebert, Shelley)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; and granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 9/22/2020. (cjc)
September 21, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Shelley R. Hebert; #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Ian H. Morrison. (JH)
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Shelley R. Hebert Receipt Number AGASDC-2928485, Fee Amount $200, by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Responses due by 10/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hart, Daniel)
September 21, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Ian H. Morrison Receipt Number AGASDC-2928468, Fee Amount $200, by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Responses due by 10/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hart, Daniel)
September 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P. Hart on behalf of The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Hart, Daniel)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Shirley A. Clark. The Prudential Insurance Company of America waiver sent on 7/28/2020, answer due 9/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Waiver of the Service of Summons form)(Karrh, Heather) Modified on 8/6/2020 (jlh).
July 28, 2020 Filing 3 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Shirley A. Clark. (Karrh, Heather)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 07/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Blank Forms.) (jlh)
July 27, 2020 Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number AGASDC-2889886. (jlh)
July 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Prudential Insurance Company of America, filed by Shirley A. Clark. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet.) (jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Shelley R. Hebert
Represented By: Daniel P. Hart
Represented By: Ian H. Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley A. Clark
Represented By: Heather K. Karrh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?