Laufer v. Bhole Shankar, Inc.
Plaintiff: Deborah Laufer
Defendant: Bhole Shankar, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00114
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Augusta Office
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12117
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING CASE re #5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. This matter is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate all motions and deadlines and closed this case. Each party shall bear its own costs and fees. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 09/17/2020. (thb)
September 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Deborah Laufer (Gillespie, Tristan)
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deborah Laufer. Bhole Shankar, Inc. served on 8/20/2020, answer due 9/10/2020. (Gillespie, Tristan)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 08/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Forms.) (jlh)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Bhole Shankar, Inc. (jlh)
August 11, 2020 Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number AGASDC-2901048. (jlh)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bhole Shankar, Inc., filed by Deborah Laufer. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet.)(jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laufer v. Bhole Shankar, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Laufer
Represented By: Tristan Wade Gillespie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bhole Shankar, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?