White v. Santander Consumer USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Danny White
Defendant: Car Max of Augusta, GA and Santander Consumer USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00115
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Augusta Office
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Santander Consumer USA, Inc. identifying Santander Consumer USA Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent.(Friedman, Rachel) Modified on 10/14/2020 (jlh).
October 12, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Car Max of Augusta, GA identifying CarMax, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Friedman, Rachel) Modified on 10/14/2020 (jlh).
October 12, 2020 Filing 9 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Car Max of Augusta, GA. (Friedman, Rachel)
October 12, 2020 Filing 8 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Santander Consumer USA, Inc. (Friedman, Rachel) Modified on 10/14/2020 (jlh).
October 12, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, MOTION to Dismiss by Car Max of Augusta, GA, Santander Consumer USA, Inc. Responses due by 10/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Amanda Van Haren, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Eddie Blitsch, #3 Exhibit C - American Arbitration Association Rule R-14, #4 Exhibit D - JAMS Arbitration Rules, Rule 11)(Friedman, Rachel) Modified on 10/14/2020 (jlh).
September 23, 2020 Filing 6 REMARK of service. (jlh)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing Plaintiff to serve Defendants within ninety days from the date his complaint was filed. (Compliance due by 11/16/2020.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 09/09/2020. (Attachment: #1 Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.) (jlh)
September 8, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number AUG028207. (jlh)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 08/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Forms.) (jlh)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint. (Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings (signature page) due by 8/1/2020.) (jlh)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Fee Deficiency re #1 Complaint. (Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 9/8/2020.) (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion Form.) (jlh)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all Defendants, filed by Danny White.(jlh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/8/2020: #1 Signature Page) (jlh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Santander Consumer USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Car Max of Augusta, GA
Represented By: Rachel Ross Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santander Consumer USA, Inc.
Represented By: Rachel Ross Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?