Smith v. Walmart, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Penny Smith
Defendant: A.B.C. and Walmart, Inc. and/or A.B.C. that individual partnership, foreign profit corporation and/or non-profit corporation, company and/or limited liability company doing business as the same located at 596 Bobby Jones Expy, Augusta, GA on July 11, 2019 doing
Case Number: 1:2021cv00055
Filed: March 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/24/2021; Discovery due by 9/13/2021; Motions due by 10/13/2021; Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 7/2/2021; Expert Witness Report (Defendant) due by 8/31/2021; and Joint Status Report due by 9/13/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 05/07/2021. (jlh)
May 6, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Reid V. Sanders on behalf of Penny Smith (Sanders, Reid)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDERED that by Friday, May 7, 2021, Plaintiffs counsel shall enter an appearance file his notice of appearance or notify the Court of Plaintiffs intentions. (Compliance due by 5/7/2021). Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 5/5/21. (wwp)
May 4, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (JH)
May 3, 2021 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Beaton, Ernest)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED that the parties are to conduct a conference within fourteen days of the date of this Order and to file a joint 26(f) Report within seven days of the conference. The Court DIRECTS the CLERK to attach the standard RULE 26(f) REPORT to this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 5/3/21. (Attachments: #1 Rule 26(f) Report) (loh)
May 3, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Rule 26(f) Report due by 5/24/2021. (loh)
March 30, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walmart, Inc. identifying Walmart Inc as Corporate Parent.. (Beaton, Ernest)
March 30, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walmart, Inc. identifying Walmart Inc as Corporate Parent.. (Beaton, Ernest)
March 25, 2021 Filing 3 REMOVAL NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 4/4/2021. Pending Motions due by 4/8/2021. (ca)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 3/25/2021. (ca)
March 25, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of Richmond County, Georgia, case number 2021RCCV00128. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGASDC-3069691), filed by Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Superior Court Filings including Answer of Defendant, Walmart, Inc., #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Walmart, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.B.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc. and/or A.B.C. that individual partnership, foreign profit corporation and/or non-profit corporation, company and/or limited liability company doing business as the same located at 596 Bobby Jones Expy, Augusta, GA on July 11, 2019 doing
Represented By: Ernest L. Beaton, IV
Represented By: Howard M. Lessinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penny Smith
Represented By: Reid V. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?