Owners Insurance Company et al v. Advanced Sleep Technologies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Owners Insurance Company and Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Defendant: Joseph L. Poole, Stephen Ronald Callahan, Jr., University Sleep Associates, Advanced Sleep Technologies, Inc., Linda Callahan and Augusta Lung Associates, LLP
Case Number: 1:2021cv00086
Filed: May 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2021 Filing 24 Brief in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Owners Insurance Company. (Brock, Chad)
July 1, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss by Augusta Lung Associates, LLP, University Sleep Associates. Responses due by 7/15/2021. (Painter, James)
July 1, 2021 Filing 22 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Advanced Sleep Technologies, Inc.. (Bitting, Neil)
July 1, 2021 Filing 21 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Joseph L. Poole. (Bitting, Neil)
June 30, 2021 Filing 20 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Joseph L. Poole. (Bitting, Neil)
June 30, 2021 Filing 19 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Advanced Sleep Technologies, Inc.. (Bitting, Neil)
June 30, 2021 Filing 18 Advanced Sleep Technologies, Inc. and Poole ANSWER to Complaint by Advanced Sleep Technologies, Inc., Joseph L. Poole.(Bitting, Neil)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave of Absence. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 6/23/2021. (cjc)
June 23, 2021 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Owners Insurance Company, Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Brock, Chad)
June 23, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Owners Insurance Company, Auto-Owners Insurance Company. Stephen Ronald Callahan, Jr waiver sent on 6/16/2021, answer due 8/15/2021. (Brock, Chad)
June 23, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Owners Insurance Company, Auto-Owners Insurance Company. Linda Callahan waiver sent on 6/16/2021, answer due 8/15/2021. (Brock, Chad)
June 22, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Owners Insurance Company for dates of : July 19, 2021 through and including July 30, 2021; September 3, 2021 through and including September 13, 2021; November 19, 2021 through and including November 29, 2021; and December 24, 2021 through and including January 7, 2022 by Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Owners Insurance Company. Responses due by 7/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kendall, Michael)
June 22, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #13 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Owners Insurance Company. (thb)
June 15, 2021 Filing 12 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Owners Insurance Company. (Howard, Matthew)
June 15, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Owners Insurance Company, Auto-Owners Insurance Company. University Sleep Associates served on 6/9/2021, answer due 6/30/2021. (Howard, Matthew)
June 15, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Owners Insurance Company, Auto-Owners Insurance Company. Augusta Lung Associates, LLP served on 6/9/2021, answer due 6/30/2021. (Howard, Matthew)
June 15, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Owners Insurance Company, Auto-Owners Insurance Company. Joseph L. Poole served on 6/10/2021, answer due 7/1/2021. (Howard, Matthew)
June 15, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Owners Insurance Company, Auto-Owners Insurance Company. Advanced Sleep Technologies, Inc. served on 6/10/2021, answer due 7/1/2021. (Howard, Matthew)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; and granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 6/10/2021. (cjc)
June 9, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Chad M. Brock, Esq. Receipt Number AGASDC-3121648, Fee Amount $200, #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael C. Kendall, Esq. Receipt Number AGASDC-3121630, Fee Amount $200. (JH)
June 8, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Chad M. Brock, Esq. Receipt Number AGASDC-3121648, Fee Amount $200, by Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Owners Insurance Company. Responses due by 6/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing (Chad M. Brock))(Howard, Matthew)
June 8, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael C. Kendall, Esq. Receipt Number AGASDC-3121630, Fee Amount $200, by Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Owners Insurance Company. Responses due by 6/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing (Michael C. Kendall, Esq.))(Howard, Matthew)
May 27, 2021 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Owners Insurance Company. (Howard, Matthew)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 05/26/2021. (maa)
May 26, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (maa)
May 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Owners Insurance Company, Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(maa)
May 26, 2021 Filing fee: $402, receipt number AGASDC-3113420. (maa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owners Insurance Company et al v. Advanced Sleep Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph L. Poole
Represented By: Neil Staten Bitting, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Ronald Callahan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University Sleep Associates
Represented By: James V. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Sleep Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Neil Staten Bitting, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Augusta Lung Associates, LLP
Represented By: James V. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew Brandon Howard
Represented By: Chad M. Brock
Represented By: Michael C. Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew Brandon Howard
Represented By: Chad M. Brock
Represented By: Michael C. Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?