Blackdirt Farm Management, LLC v. Martin et al
Defendant: Oak Lake Cattle Company, Incorporated and Chris Martin
Counter Defendant: Blackdirt Farm Management, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00097
Filed: June 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 181
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2021 Filing 29 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Consent Revised Scheduling Order) by Blackdirt Farm Management, LLC. Responses due by 1/4/2022. (McKie, Joel)
December 15, 2021 Filing 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held by telephone before Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps: Motion Hearing by telephone held on 12/15/2021 re #25 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Expedited)/Contested filed by Oak Lake Cattle Company, Incorporated, Chris Martin. The parties will file a consent motion that will moot the current motion for extension. (Court Reporter FTR.) (cjc)
December 14, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Hearing by telephone on Motion #25 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Expedited)/Contested : Motion Hearing by telephone set for 12/15/2021 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps. Please dial 877-336-1829, enter code 5508163 and enter password 0097 to access the teleconference.(cjc)
December 13, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Intent to Respond in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Extend by Blackdirt Farm Management, LLC re #25 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Expedited)/Contested. (McKie, Joel)
December 10, 2021 Filing 25 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Expedited)/Contested by Chris Martin, Oak Lake Cattle Company, Incorporated. Responses due by 12/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Keogh, William)
December 10, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #25 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Expedited)/Contested. (thb)
September 2, 2021 Filing 24 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Counterclaim of Oak Lake Cattle Company, ANSWER to Counterclaim by Blackdirt Farm Management, LLC.(McKie, Joel)
September 2, 2021 Filing 23 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Counterclaim (Restated) of Chris Martin by Blackdirt Farm Management, LLC.(McKie, Joel) Link added. Modified on 9/2/2021 (thb).
August 31, 2021 Filing 22 Defendants Chris Martin and Oak Lake Cattle Company, Incorporated's ANSWER to Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM (Restated) against Blackdirt Farm Management, LLC by Oak Lake Cattle Company, Incorporated, Chris Martin.(Keogh, William)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/4/2021. Discovery due by 12/21/2021. Motions due by 1/20/2022. Status Report due by 12/21/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 8/30/2021. (ca)
August 30, 2021 Filing 20 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (McKie, Joel)
August 30, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #20 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (thb)
August 30, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 10/19/2021. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 11/18/2021. (thb)
August 17, 2021 Filing 19 ANSWER to Counterclaim (and Affirmative Defenses) by Blackdirt Farm Management, LLC.(McKie, Joel)
August 17, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to Counterclaim (and Affirmative Defenses) by Blackdirt Farm Management, LLC.(McKie, Joel)
August 17, 2021 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) against All Defendants, filed by Blackdirt Farm Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreement for Preconditioning Cattle)(McKie, Joel)
August 3, 2021 Filing 16 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Chris Martin. (Keogh, William)
August 3, 2021 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Chris Martin. (Keogh, William)
August 3, 2021 Filing 14 Defendant Oak Lake Cattle Company, Incorporated's Amended ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Blackdirt Farm Management, LLC by Oak Lake Cattle Company, Incorporated.(Keogh, William)
August 3, 2021 Filing 13 Defendant Chris Martin's ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Blackdirt Farm Management, LLC by Chris Martin.(Keogh, William)
July 15, 2021 Filing 12 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Oak Lake Cattle Company, Incorporated. (Keogh, William)
July 15, 2021 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Oak Lake Cattle Company, Incorporated. (Keogh, William)
July 15, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Oak Lake Cattle Company, Incorporated.(Keogh, William)
July 14, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #8 Affidavit of Service. (thb)
July 14, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Chris Martin answer due 8/3/2021. (thb)
July 13, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Chris Martin on 07/13/2021, filed by Blackdirt Farm Management, LLC. (Atkinson, Austin) Modified on 7/14/2021 (thb).
July 7, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Austin Atkinson on behalf of Blackdirt Farm Management, LLC (Atkinson, Austin)
July 7, 2021 Filing 6 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Blackdirt Farm Management, LLC. (McKie, Joel)
July 1, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Oak Lake Cattle Company, Incorporated answer due 7/15/2021. (slt)
June 29, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Jim Byrd of Oak Lake Cattle Company, Inc. on 6/24/21, filed by Blackdirt Farm Management, LLC. (Atkinson, Austin)
June 23, 2021 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Blackdirt Farm Management, LLC. (McKie, Joel)
June 22, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (csr)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 6/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Filing Forms). (csr)
June 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Blackdirt Farm Management, LLC. $402.00 Filing Fee Paid - Receipt Number: AGASDC-3131662. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (csr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackdirt Farm Management, LLC v. Martin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oak Lake Cattle Company, Incorporated
Represented By: William James Keogh, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Martin
Represented By: William James Keogh, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Blackdirt Farm Management, LLC
Represented By: Joel L. McKie
Represented By: Austin Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?