Davis v. Resurgent Capital Services, LP
Plaintiff: Dorothy Davis
Defendant: Resurgent Capital Services, LP
Case Number: 1:2023cv00171
Filed: November 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE by Resurgent Capital Services, LP re #5 MOTION for More Definite Statement of Plaintiff's Non-Response (Springfield, R.)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Stay discovery, and stays all discovery pending the resolution of the #5 Motion for a more definite statement. If the case is to continue after resolution of that motion, the parties shall confer and submit a Rule 26(f) Report within seven days of the presiding District Judge's ruling. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 01/08/2024. (jlh)
January 5, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Resurgent Capital Services, LP. Responses due by 1/19/2024. (Springfield, R.)
January 5, 2024 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Stay Discovery. (csr)
November 29, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Resurgent Capital Services, LP. Responses due by 12/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 Briefs Memorandum of Law in Support)(Springfield, R.)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER providing Plaintiff with basic instructions regarding her case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/28/2023. (maa)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/22/2023. (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Forms.) (jlh)
November 22, 2023 Filing 2 Removal NOTICE to All Counsel of Record. (Set/Reset Deadlines: Resurgent Capital Services, LP answer due 11/29/2023; Compliance due by 12/2/2023.) (jlh)
November 22, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Magistrate Court of Richmond County, Georgia, case number 2023M03567, filed by Resurgent Capital Services, LP. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGASDC-3709695.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statement of Claim and Envelope, and #2 Civil Cover Sheet.) (jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Resurgent Capital Services, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resurgent Capital Services, LP
Represented By: R. Frank Springfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?