STOKES v. CLERK SUPERIOR COURT OF RICHMOND COUNTY
Petitioner: Joshua Kareem Stokes
Respondent: Clerk Superior Court Of Richmond County and Richmond County
Not Classified By Court: Attorney General State of Georgia (Notice Only)
Case Number: 1:2023cv00178
Filed: November 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Joshua Kareem Stokes. Responses due by 1/31/2024. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps. (jlh)
January 17, 2024 Filing 7 Amended PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Joshua Kareem Stokes. (jlh)
December 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing Petitioner to either pay the $5.00 filing fee or submit a complete IFP motion, with supporting documentation, within twenty-one days of the date of this Order; directing Petitioner to amend his #1 Petition within twenty-one days of this Order. (Compliance re filing fee due by 1/19/2024; Amended Pleadings due by 1/19/2024.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 12/29/2023. (Attachments: #1 IFP Short Form, #2 2254 Petition Form.) (jlh)
November 30, 2023 Filing 5 Filing Fee Deficiency NOTICE. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 12/21/2023. (Attachments: #1 AO 240) (pts)
November 30, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Transfer. (pts)
November 30, 2023 Filing 3 Case transfer in from District of Georgia Middle; Case Number 5:23-cv-00477. Case transferred electronically
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF TRANSFER transferring proceedings to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Georgia - Augusta Division. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 11/30/2023. (kat)
November 30, 2023 Case Electronically Transferred Out - District Transfer to Southern District of Georgia - Augusta Division. All documents, including a certified copy of the docket sheet and pleading were transferred electronically. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**Case Transfer Acknowledgment deadline 12/14/2023. (sst)
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUSagainst CLERK SUPERIOR COURT OF RICHMOND COUNTY filed by JOSHUA KAREEM STOKES (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Envelope)(sst)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STOKES v. CLERK SUPERIOR COURT OF RICHMOND COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joshua Kareem Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Clerk Superior Court Of Richmond County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Richmond County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Attorney General State of Georgia (Notice Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?