Harris v. Shively et al
Plaintiff: Megan L. Harris
Defendant: Harry M. Shively, Truck Source Express, Inc. and Sagamore Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2024cv00003
Filed: January 5, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave of Absence. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 2/28/2024. (cjc)
February 28, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Harry M. Shively, Truck Source Express, Inc. for dates of: March 22, 2024, April 4 - 10, 2024, June 13 - 14th, 2024, June 18 - 21, 2024, July 1 - 5, 2024, and September 2 - 6, 2024 by Harry M. Shively, Truck Source Express, Inc.. Responses due by 3/13/2024. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Matthews, Zach) Modified on 2/28/2024 (csr).
February 28, 2024 MOTIONS REFERRED: #13 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Harry M. Shively, Truck Source Express, Inc. for dates of: March 22, 2024, April 4 - 10, 2024, June 13 - 14th, 2024, June 18 - 21, 2024, July 1 - 5, 2024, and September 2 - 6, 2024. (csr)
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER terminating #10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 02/27/2024. (ek)
February 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting re #9 Motion to Stay Proceedings. The Clerk is directed to STAY all proceedings, including all discovery and deadlines, in this case. Upon completion of mediation, the Parties may move the Court to lift the stay via motion filed on the public docket. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 2/26/24. (loh)
February 15, 2024 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Matthews, Zach)
February 15, 2024 MOTIONS REFERRED: #10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (csr)
February 13, 2024 Filing 9 Consent MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Sagamore Insurance Company. Responses due by 2/27/2024. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Consent Motion to Stay Proceedings)(Hostetter, Michael)
January 16, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by William Robert McCracken on behalf of Megan L. Harris (McCracken, William)
January 12, 2024 Filing 7 Special ANSWER to Complaint by Harry M. Shively, Truck Source Express, Inc..(Matthews, Zach)
January 11, 2024 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Refiled) by Sagamore Insurance Company.(Hostetter, Michael)
January 11, 2024 Filing 5 DEFICIENCY NOTICE re #4 Answer to Complaint. (pts)
January 10, 2024 Filing 4 Sagamore Insurance Company's ANSWER to Complaint by Sagamore Insurance Company.(Hostetter, Michael)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 01/08/2024. (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Forms.) (jlh)
January 8, 2024 Filing 2 Removal NOTICE to All Counsel of Record. (Set/Reset Deadlines: Harry M. Shively answer due 1/12/2024; Truck Source Express, Inc. answer due 1/12/2024. Compliance due by 1/18/2024.) (jlh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/8/2024: #1 Corrected Main Document) (jlh).
January 5, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of Richmond County, Georgia, case number 2023RCCV00583, filed by Truck Source Express, Inc. and Harry M. Shively. (Filing fee $ 405.00, receipt number AGASDC-3735929.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, Summons, Case Filing Information Form, Standing Order for Mediation, #2 Exhibit 2 - Oregon Secretary of State re Truck Source Express, Inc., #3 Exhibit 3 - Georgia Secretary of State re Sagamore Insurance Company, #4 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Removal to State Court, and #5 Civil Cover Sheet.) (jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Shively et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan L. Harris
Represented By: William Robert McCracken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry M. Shively
Represented By: Zach M. Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truck Source Express, Inc.
Represented By: Zach M. Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sagamore Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael D. Hostetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?