Nichols v. Walmart Inc et al
Plaintiff: Doretha Nichols
Defendant: Walmart Claim Services, Inc and Walmart Inc
Case Number: 1:2024cv00069
Filed: May 14, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2024 Filing 17 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION to #16 Motion for Default Judgment as to by Doretha Nichols. Responses due by 7/23/2024. (maa)
July 5, 2024 Motions No Longer Referred: #16 MOTION for Default Judgment as to (pts)
July 3, 2024 Filing 14 U.S. Marshal Return as to Walmart Claims Registered Agent at CT Corporation System. U.S. Marshal Return Executed Walmart Inc on 6/20/24. (wwp) Modified on 7/3/2024 (wwp).
July 3, 2024 MOTIONS REFERRED: #16 MOTION for Default Judgment. (thb)
July 2, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION for Default Judgment as to by Doretha Nichols. Responses due by 7/17/2024. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(maa)
July 2, 2024 Filing 15 AMENDED RESPONSE to Order filed by Doretha Nichols. (maa)
July 2, 2024 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Walmart Claim Services, Inc. Walmart Claim Services, Inc waiver sent on 06/10/2024, answer due 08/09/2024. (Lee, Carolyn) Modified on 7/2/2024 (thb).
July 2, 2024 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Walmart Inc. Walmart Inc waiver sent on 6/10/2024, answer due 08/09/2024. (Lee, Carolyn) Modified on 7/2/2024 (thb).
July 2, 2024 Set/Reset Deadlines: Walmart Claim Services, Inc answer due 8/9/2024; Walmart Inc answer due 8/9/2024. (thb)
July 1, 2024 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO ORDER filed by Doretha Nichols. (maa)
June 28, 2024 Filing 10 USMS Service Remark - Certificate of Service was signed by Name not legible on 6/20/24. (wwp)
June 27, 2024 Filing 9 RESPONSE and Jury Demand re #7 Answer to Complaint filed by Walmart Inc and #8 Answer to Complaint filed by Walmart Claim Services, Inc., by Doretha Nichols. (jlh)
June 17, 2024 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 7/10/2024. (wwp)
June 10, 2024 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Walmart Claim Services, Inc.(Lee, Carolyn)
June 10, 2024 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Walmart Inc.(Lee, Carolyn)
June 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing USMS Service of Process re #1 Complaint and this Order upon Defendants Walmart and Walmart Claims and request that Defendants waive formal service of the summons. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 06/06/2024. (Attachments: #1 Walmart's Registered Agent, and #2 Walmart Claim's Registered Agent.) (jlh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2024: #3 AO399 and GAS398) (wwp).
June 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If in the future, however, it appears that Plaintiff's financial situation has improved, the Court may act on its own initiative to require her to pay either the entire filing fee or an appropriately determined partial filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 06/06/2024. (jlh)
June 6, 2024 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance re USM packets due by 6/9/2024. (jlh)
May 22, 2024 Filing 4 Rule 26(f) Report by Doretha Nichols. (maa)
May 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 05/14/2024. (maa)
May 14, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Doretha Nichols. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(maa)
May 14, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Walmart Claim Services, Inc, Walmart Inc, filed by Doretha Nichols. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(maa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nichols v. Walmart Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Claim Services, Inc
Represented By: Carolyn Louise Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc
Represented By: Carolyn Louise Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doretha Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?