Favors v. Summers, et al
Plaintiff: Angela Favors Morrell
Defendant: Paul O'Neill
Case Number: 2:2000cv00158
Filed: October 25, 2000
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Brunswick Office
County: Glynn
Presiding Judge: R. Stan Baker
Presiding Judge: Lisa G. Wood
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2003
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER denying 118 Motion For An Injunction Limiting Future Filings; denying 123 Motion to Vacate and denying 127 Motion to Reopen Case. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 6/30/2017. (csr)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 113 Motion to Vacate 88 Order. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 1/24/2017. (ca)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER denying as moot Plaintiff's 105 Motion to Change Venue; denying 106 Motion to Reopen Case; denying 107 Motion to Vacate ; denying as moot 110 Motion for Conference with the Defendants. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 5/22/2015. (ca)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Favors v. Summers, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Favors Morrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul O'Neill
Represented By: Melissa Stebbins Mundell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?