Southeast LandCo, LLC v. 150 Beachview Holdings, LLC

Case Number: 2:2006cv00177
Filed: August 11, 2006
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Brunswick Office
Presiding Judge: Anthony A. Alaimo
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2010 Record Transferred to FRC. Group 021, Accession 10-0384, Box 3 of 19, (slt)
February 25, 2008 52 Receipt for Exhibits. (csr)
February 14, 2008 51 Receipt for Exhibits. (csr)
February 13, 2008 Set/Reset Deadlines: Notice of Compliance due by 2/22/2008. (csr)
February 13, 2008 50 Letter notifying counsel to retrieve exhibits. (csr)
February 13, 2008 49 Letter notifying counsel to retrieve exhibits. (csr)
February 13, 2008 48 Letter notifying counsel to retrieve exhibits. (csr)
February 13, 2008 47 Letter notifying counsel to retrieve exhibits. (csr)
February 13, 2008 46 Letter notifying counsel to retrieve exhibits. (csr)
February 13, 2008 45 Letter notifying counsel to retrieve exhibits. (csr)
February 13, 2008 44 Letter notifying counsel to retrieve exhibits. (csr)
May 11, 2007 Opinion or Order 43 ORDER granting 42 Motion for Leave of Absence for Glen Darbyshire . Signed by Judge James E. Graham on 5/11/07. (slt)
May 8, 2007 MOTIONS 42 MOTION for Leave of Absence For dates of : June 29, 2007 through July 9, 2007 by Glen M. Darbyshire REFERRED to Judge Graham. (slt)
May 8, 2007 42 MOTION for Leave of Absence For dates of : June 29, 2007 through July 9, 2007 by Glen M. Darbyshire . Responses due by 5/23/2007 (evb)
February 15, 2007 Opinion or Order 41 ORDER granting 40 Motion for Leave of Absence for Glen Darbyshire . Signed by Judge James E. Graham on 2/15/07. (slt)
February 13, 2007 40 MOTION for Leave of Absence For dates of : 8/3/07 to 8/16/07 by Glen M. Darbyshire on behalf of 150 Beachview Holdings, LLC. REFERRED to Judge Graham.(slt)
January 17, 2007 Opinion or Order 39 ORDER granting 38 Motion for Leave of Absence for dates of 2/6/07 through 2/13/07, 3/21/07 through 3/23/07, 4/25/07 through 4/27/07, 5/17/07 through 5/18/07, and 5/31/07 through 6/4/07. Signed by Judge James E. Graham on 1/17/2007. (CA)
January 10, 2007 38 MOTION for Leave of Absence For dates of : 2/6/07 to 2/13/07, 3/21/07 to 3/23/07, 4/25/07, 5/1707 to 5/18/07, and 5/31/07 to 6/4/07 by Glen M. Darbyshire on behalf of 150 Beachview Holdings, LLC. REFERRED to Judge Graham.(slt)
October 4, 2006 Opinion or Order 37 ORDER granting 36 Motion for withdrawal of its deposit into Registry of Court; directing Clerk to return pltf's deposit plus any income earned on such funds minus 10% of income earned . Signed by Judge Anthony A. Alaimo on 10/4/06. (slt)
October 2, 2006 36 MOTION for withdrawal of its deposit into Registry by Southeast LandCo, LLC. (slt)
September 29, 2006 35 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/29/06 before Judge A.A. Alaimo. Court Reporter: Norma Hatfield. (jsr)
September 21, 2006 Opinion or Order 34 ORDER granting 19 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Signed by Judge Anthony A. Alaimo on 9/21/06. (jsr)
August 29, 2006 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Notice of Compliance due by 9/18/2006. (jsr)
August 29, 2006 33 Exhibit List by Southeast LandCo, LLC.. (jsr)
August 29, 2006 32 Witness List by Southeast LandCo, LLC. (jsr)
August 29, 2006 31 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Anthony A. Alaimo : Evidentiary Hearing and Motion Hearing held on 8/29/2006 re 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by 150 Beachview Holdings, LLC,, 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Southeast LandCo, LLC,; Court reserve ruling on motion to dismiss; parties to report back to the Court concerning settlement by 9/18/06. (Court Reporter Norma Hatfield.) (jsr)
August 29, 2006 30 Witness and Exhibit List by 150 Beachview Holdings, LLC. (slt)
August 29, 2006 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Susannah Rogers Pedigo on behalf of 150 Beachview Holdings, LLC (slt)
August 25, 2006 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by 150 Beachview Holdings, LLC. (jsr)
August 23, 2006 27 RESPONSE to Motion re 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Southeast LandCo, LLC. (slt)
August 22, 2006 Opinion or Order 25 ORDER setting motion hrg re 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Southeast LandCo, LLC, and 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by 150 Beachview Holdings, LLC,; response to motionto dismiss due by 8/23/06 and reply brief due by 8/25/06. Court orders parties to have principals available on 8/29/06 w/full and complete settlement authority under pain of having defenses stricken. Evidentiary Hearing set for 8/29/2006 10:00 AM in Brunswick - Courtroom No. 1 - before Judge Anthony A. Alaimo.. Signed by Judge Anthony A. Alaimo on 8/21/06. (jsr)
August 21, 2006 26 TRANSCRIPT of motion hearing held on 8/18/06 before Judge Alaimo. Court Reporter: Norma Hatfield. (slt)
August 18, 2006 Set/Reset Deadlines: Brief due by 8/23/2006. Reply brief due by 8/25/06. (bar)
August 18, 2006 Set/Reset Hearings: Evidentiary Hearing set for 8/29/2006 10:00 AM in Brunswick - Courtroom No. 1 - before Judge Anthony A. Alaimo. Hearing on motion to dismiss and motion for preliminary injunction. (bar)
August 18, 2006 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Anthony A. Alaimo : Motion Hearing held on 8/18/2006 re 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Southeast LandCo, LLC,, 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by 150 Beachview Holdings, LLC,; Court heard arguments on motion to dismiss. Court continues hearing on motion to dismiss and motion for preliminary injunction to 8/29/06 at 10am; response to motion to dismiss due by 8/23/06 and reply brief due by 8/25/06. (Court Reporter Norma Hatfield.) (bar)
August 18, 2006 Opinion or Order 23 ORDER granting 17 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice for Ernest L. Greer . Signed by Judge James E. Graham on 8/18/06. (slt)
August 18, 2006 Opinion or Order 22 ORDER granting 18 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice for Michael J. King . Signed by Judge James E. Graham on 8/18/06. (slt)
August 18, 2006 PRO HAC VICE PAID by Ernest L. Greer for 150 Beachview Holdings, LLC; Amount $200.00 Receipt # 202657 Date: 8/18/06 (slt)
August 18, 2006 PRO HAC VICE PAID by Michael J. King for 150 Beachview Holdings, LLC; Amount $200.00 Receipt # 202658 Date: 8/18/06 (slt)
August 18, 2006 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Horne on behalf of 150 Beachview Holdings, LLC (slt)
August 18, 2006 20 MEMORANDUM in Support re 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by 150 Beachview Holdings, LLC. (slt)
August 18, 2006 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of subject matter Jurisdiction by 150 Beachview Holdings, LLC. Responses due by 9/5/2006 (slt)
August 18, 2006 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael M. King by 150 Beachview Holdings, LLC. REFERRED to Judge Graham.(slt)
August 18, 2006 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ernest L. Greer by 150 Beachview Holdings, LLC. REFERRED to Judge Graham.(slt)
August 17, 2006 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Glen M. Darbyshire on behalf of 150 Beachview Holdings, LLC (jsr)
August 17, 2006 15 Proposed Findings of Fact by 150 Beachview Holdings, LLC. (jsr)
August 17, 2006 14 BRIEF in Support of Pltf's basis for jurisdiction re 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Southeast LandCo, LLC. (jsr)
August 17, 2006 13 BRIEF in Support re 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Southeast LandCo, LLC. (jsr)
August 17, 2006 12 AMENDED MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Southeast LandCo, LLC. (jsr)
August 17, 2006 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT and REQUEST for Preliminary Injunction against 150 Beachview Holdings, LLC, filed by Southeast LandCo, LLC.(jsr)
August 17, 2006 11 Proposed Findings of Fact by Southeast LandCo, LLC. (jsr)
August 17, 2006 Opinion or Order 7 ORDER directing parties to file proposed findings of fact and concl of law prior to 5:00 P.M., 8/17/06 Notice of Compliance due by 8/17/2006.. Signed by Judge Anthony A. Alaimo on 8/17/06. (jsr)
August 16, 2006 Opinion or Order 10 GENERAL ORDER re: Registry Fee. Signed by Judge B. Avant Edenfield on 8/16/06. (slt)
August 16, 2006 9 CERTIFICATE of Clerk that pltf has deposited $100,000.00 into Registry of the Court. (slt)
August 16, 2006 8 NOTICE of deposit into Registry of the Court by Southeast LandCo, LLC (slt)
August 14, 2006 Opinion or Order 6 ORDER granting a temporarily restraining Order prohibiting the sale of property and scheduling hearing re 5 Notice (Other) filed by Southeast LandCo, LLC,; TRO shall become effective upon the filing of a good & sufficient bond by Pltf approved by the Clerk in the amt of $100,000, to abide final jgm in this case, this TRO shall expire w/in 10 days of the date of this Order. Evidentiary Hearing set for 8/18/2006 10:00 AM in Brunswick - Courtroom No. 1 - before Judge Anthony A. Alaimo.. Signed by Judge Anthony A. Alaimo on 8/14/06. (jsr)
August 14, 2006 5 NOTICE of filing lis pendens by Southeast LandCo, LLC (slt)
August 11, 2006 Opinion or Order 4 GENERAL ORDER re: Rule 26.f Report. Signed by Judge James E. Graham on 8/11/06. (slt)
August 11, 2006 3 CERTIFICATE pursuant to Local Rule 3-2 by Southeast LandCo, LLC. (slt)
August 11, 2006 2 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Southeast LandCo, LLC. (slt)
August 11, 2006 1 COMPLAINT against 150 Beachview Holdings, LLC ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 202639), filed by Southeast LandCo, LLC.(slt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southeast LandCo, LLC v. 150 Beachview Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?