Favors-Morrell v. United States Of America
Plaintiff: Angela Favors-Morrell
Defendant: United States Of America
Case Number: 2:2011cv00091
Filed: June 6, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Brunswick Office
County: Glynn
Presiding Judge: James E. Graham
Presiding Judge: Lisa G. Wood
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER denying 63 Motion for Reconsideration re 62 Order on Motion to Vacate Order for fraud on the Court pursuant to Rule 60(d)(3). Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 7/21/2017. (ca)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER denying 56 Motion to Vacate Order for fraud on the Court pursuant to Rule 60(d)(3) and 59 RESPONSE/Motion to Reopen. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 6/30/2017. (ca)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 47 Motion to Vacate 15 Order on Motion to Dismiss, 46 Order on Motion to Change Venue, Order on Motion to Reopen Case, Order on Motion for Hearing. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 1/24/2017. (ca)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Favors-Morrell v. United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Favors-Morrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?