A&J Manufacturing, LLC et al v. Academy, Ltd.
Plaintiff: |
A&J Manufacturing, LLC and A&J Manufacturing, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Academy, Ltd. and Ningbo Huige Outdoor Products Co., Ltd. |
Case Number: |
2:2013cv00113 |
Filed: |
August 21, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia |
Office: |
Brunswick Office |
County: |
Glynn |
Presiding Judge: |
James E. Graham |
Presiding Judge: |
Lisa G. Wood |
Nature of Suit: |
Patent |
Cause of Action: |
35 U.S.C. § 271 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 18, 2022 |
Filing
87
ORDER re 86 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal. Accordingly, all claims asserted in this action are dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own fees and costs. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 7/17/22. (loh)
|
February 1, 2022 |
Filing
81
ORDER re the parties 80 Status Report. The Court Orders the stay imposed in its February 7, 2018 Order 50 remain in place until May 1, 2022. (Status Report due by 5/1/2022.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 2/1/2022. (ca)
|
February 9, 2021 |
Filing
70
ORDER re 69 Status Report filed by Ningbo Huige Outdoor Products Co., Ltd., Academy, Ltd. The Court ORDERS that the stay imposed in its February 7, 2018 Order remain in place until May 1, 2021. The parties shall file a joint report on or befo re May 1, 2021 describing the status of the rehearing request or any appeal of the '712 Patent reexamination proceedings. (End of Stay 5/1/2021.) (Status Report due by 5/1/2021.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 02/09/2021. (MG)
|
October 5, 2020 |
Filing
67
ORDER re 66 Status Report filed by Ningbo Huige Outdoor Products Co., Ltd., Academy, Ltd. The Court ORDERS that the stay imposed in its February 7, 2018 Order remain in place until February 1, 2021. The parties shall file a joint report on or before February 1, 2021 describing the status of the rehearing request or any appeal of the '712 Patent reexamination proceedings. (Compliance: End of Stay 2/1/2021. Status Report due by 2/1/2021.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 10/5/2020. (ca)
|
July 13, 2020 |
Filing
63
ORDER that the stay imposed in its February 7, 2018 Order remain in place until August 3, 2020. The parties shall file a joint report on or before August 7, 2020 describing the status of any appeal of the 712 Patent reexamination proceedings. (Stay ends 8/3/2020. Status Report due by 8/7/2020.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 7/13/2020. (ca)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?