Camden County, Georgia v. Lexon Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Camden County, Georgia
Defendant: Lexon Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2014cv00020
Filed: February 10, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Brunswick Office
County: Camden
Presiding Judge: James E. Graham
Presiding Judge: Lisa G. Wood
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 245 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE ORDER as to Lexon Insurance Company. (wwp)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER denying as moot all pending discovery and dispositive motions 168 , 173 , 186 , 201 . Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 8/31/2017. (ca)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER SETTING MEDIATION, (Mediation Conference set for 4/13/2017 09:00 AM in Savannah - before Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps). Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 3/31/17. (cmr)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER denying Rob's 110 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 1/10/2017. (ca)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting Lexon's 68 Motion to Dismiss the Intervenors' Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 9/1/2015. (ca)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Camden County, Georgia v. Lexon Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camden County, Georgia
Represented By: G. Todd Carter
Represented By: Garret W. Meader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexon Insurance Company
Represented By: Geremy W. Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?