Flowers v. Shaw et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Flowers
Defendant: Herb Shaw, Ricky A. Reddish, Sr., Don Darden, Nick Harris, Bobby Townsend, Ray House, Geneva D. Nichols, City of Jesup Police Department, Mark Lane, Jonathan McCullough, Candace Phillips, Ty Brooks and William Chitty
Case Number: 2:2014cv00138
Filed: September 15, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Brunswick Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: James E. Graham
Presiding Judge: Lisa G. Wood
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER ADOPTING 39 Report and Recommendations of the Magistrate Judge as the opinion of the Court. The Court GRANTS Defendant Brooks' and Defendant Lane's and Pruitt's unopposed Motions for Summary Judgment and DISMISSES Plaintiff� 39;s claims against Defendants Brooks, Lane, and Pruitt. In addition, the Court DISMISSES, without prejudice, Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Chitty and McCullough. The Court DISMISSES Plaintiff's Complaint and DIRECTS the Clerk to enter the appropriate judgment of dismissal and to CLOSE this case. The Court DENIES Plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 5/17/2016. (ca)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that the Court GRANT Defendant Brook's 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment and DISMISS Defendants Lane's and Pruitt's 35 MOTION for Summary Judgment and DISMISS Plaintiff's claims against these three Defendants. I also RECOMMEND the Court DISMISS without prejudice Plaintiff's claims against Chitty and McCullough, and DIRECT the Clerk to enter the appropriate judgment of dismissal and to CLOSE this case. I further RECOMMEN D that the Court DENY Plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. The Court ORDERS any party seeking to object to this Report and Recommendation to file specific written objections within fourteen (14) days of the date on which this Report and Recommendation is entered (Objections to R&R due by 5/6/2016). ORDER directing service of the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 4/22/2016. (ca)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ADOPTING 7 Report and Recommendations of the Magistrate Judge. Plaintiff's claims against Reddish, Darden, Harris, Townsend, House, Nichols, Shaw, and the City of Jesup Police Department are dismissed. Plaintiff's claim that his arrest was improper is also dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 1/15/2015. (ca)
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing the United States Marshal to serve a copy of the complaint and a copy of this Order upon Defendants Lane, McCullough, Chitty, Phillips, and Brooks. Generally, a defendant who timely returns the waiver is not required to answer the complaint until sixty days after the date that the marshal sent the request for waiver. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 12/1/2014. (csr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flowers v. Shaw et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herb Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky A. Reddish, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Darden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geneva D. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Jesup Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan McCullough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candace Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ty Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Chitty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?