Rosales v. Watts et al
Plaintiff: Javier Rosales
Defendant: Harrell Watts, Raymond E. Holt, John V. Flournoy, Ken Harris, Jr. and Sam Kirchoff
Case Number: 2:2015cv00094
Filed: July 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Brunswick Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: R. Stan Baker
Presiding Judge: Lisa G. Wood
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 54 . Court dismisses complaint without prejudice. Court denies plaintiff leave to appeal in forma pauperis. Court dismisses as moot 50 Motion to Compel and 51 Motion to Dismiss. Clerk is directed to enter appropriate judgment of dismissal. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 1/10/17. (slt)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER ADOPTING 48 Report and Recommendations of the Magistrate Judge as the opinion of the Court and DENIES Plaintiff's 27 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 8/18/2016. (ca)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that the Court DENY Plaintiff's 27 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. The Court ORDERS any party seeking to object to this Report and Recommendation to file specific written objections within fourteen (14) days of the date on which this Report and Recommendation is entered (Objections to R&R due by 8/9/2016). ORDER directing service of the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 7/26/2016. (ca)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 25 Motion for Reconsideration re 22 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations. The Court's 3/15/16, Order remains the Order of the Court. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 6/17/2016. (ca)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ADOPTING 8 Report and Recommendations of the Magistrate Judge, as supplemented herein, as the opinion of the Court. The Court DISMISSES Plaintiff's claims for monetary damages against Defendants in their official capacities. The Court a lso DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiff's Bivens claims for punitive and compensatory damages. Additionally, for the reasons stated above, the Court DISMISSES Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment claims, as well as his claims brought pursuant to the Federal Tort Claims Act. The Court DENIES Plaintiff's Request for Consolidation. Plaintiff's Bivens and RFRA claims will proceed against Defendants in the manner set forth by the Magistrate Judge. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to file Plaintiff's proposed Complaint, dkt. no. 15-1, on the docket of this case as Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 3/15/2016. (ca)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing the USM to serve in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(i) re 1 Complaint filed by Javier Rosales. Thus, in addition to service upon Defendants individually, a copy of the complaint and summons shall be delivered, in the manner prescribed by Rule 4(i) to the U.S. Attorney for the SDGA (or the civil process clerk of the same), and the Attorney General of the U.S. at Washington, DC. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 1/4/2016. (ca)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosales v. Watts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrell Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond E. Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John V. Flournoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Harris, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Kirchoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?