T.A.N. v. PNI Digital Media, Inc.
Plaintiff: T.A.N.
Defendant: PNI Digital Media, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv00132
Filed: September 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Brunswick Office
County: Glynn
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: R Stan Baker-MJ
2 Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #42 Motion for Settlement, and this case is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate all deadlines and motions and to close this case. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 12/1/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (ca)
November 17, 2017 Filing 45 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lisa G. Wood: Settlement Hearing held on 11/17/2017. (Court Reporter Debbie Gilbert.) (WS) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/27/2017: #1 Corrected Minutes) (WS).
November 6, 2017 Filing 44 NOTICE by T.A.N. of Exclusions from Class Settlement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Requests for Exclusion)(Durham, James)
November 3, 2017 Filing 43 NOTICE by T.A.N. of Lack of Objections to Class Settlement (Durham, James)
October 20, 2017 Filing 42 MOTION for Settlement - Plaintiff's and Class Counsel's Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement and Application for Service Awards and Legal Fees and Expenses and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by T.A.N.. Responses due by 11/3/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Durham, James)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 TEXT ORDER granting #39 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Paul G. Karlsgodt. Kevin D. Bradberry has entered an appearance in this case and vouches that he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel as required by this Court's Local Rule 83.4. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on June 12, 2017. (pmh)
June 5, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Mailed Notice Program deadline is 7/17/2017. (ca)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING CLASS SETTLEMENT AND CERTIFYING SETTLEMENT CLASS re: #37 Motion. All proceedings in this Action are hereby stayed until further order of the Court, except as may be necessary to implement the terms of the Settlement. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 6/2/2017. (csr) Modified on 6/22/2017 (ca).
June 2, 2017 Filing 39 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Paul G. Karlsgodt Receipt Number 113J-2170321, Fee Amount $200, by PNI Digital Media, Inc.. Responses due by 6/16/2017. (Bradberry, Kevin)
June 2, 2017 MOTIONS REFERRED: #39 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Requested by Paul G. Karlsgodt, Esquire. (csr)
May 25, 2017 Filing 38 Joint Statement Pursuant to Rule 23(E)(3). (Webb, Edward) Modified on 5/25/2017 (ca).
May 25, 2017 Filing 37 ******* MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement), MOTION to Certify Class (Unopposed Motion for Certification of Settlement Class) by T.A.N.. Responses due by 6/8/2017. Responses due by 6/8/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Durham, James) Modified on 5/25/2017 (ca).
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER suspending all deadlines and further proceedings in this case pending the filing of the settlement agreement and the preliminary and final approval process. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 02/16/2017. (thb)
February 7, 2017 Filing 35 NOTICE of Settlement Joint Notice of Settlement and Request to Suspend Further Proceedings and Deadlines by T.A.N. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Webb, Edward)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Replies due by 2/17/2017. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 1/3/2017. (ca)
January 2, 2017 Filing 33 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Unopposed) by T.A.N.. Responses due by 1/17/2017. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Webb, Edward)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. The Court extends Defendant's deadline to file its Answer to February 28, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 12/28/2016. (Baker, R.)
December 23, 2016 Filing 31 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by PNI Digital Media, Inc.. Responses due by 1/6/2017. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bradberry, Kevin)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 AMENDED ORDER (corrected case number) re the parties #25 Consent MOTION for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 12/20/2016. (ca)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting the parties joint #25 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 12/14/2016. (ca)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting Plaintiff's Unopposed #27 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Reply in Support due by 1/5/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 12/14/2016. (ca)
December 14, 2016 MOTIONS REFERRED: #27 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (ca)
December 13, 2016 Filing 27 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court by T.A.N.. Responses due by 12/27/2016. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Webb, Edward)
December 1, 2016 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by PNI Digital Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Carson Wong)(Bradberry, Kevin)
November 29, 2016 MOTIONS REFERRED: #25 Consent MOTION for Protective Order. (ca)
November 28, 2016 Filing 25 Consent MOTION for Protective Order by PNI Digital Media, Inc.. Responses due by 12/15/2016. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bradberry, Kevin)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Responses due by 12/1/2016. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 11/16/16. (wwp)
November 17, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Responses due by 12/1/2016. (ca)
November 16, 2016 Filing 23 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court by PNI Digital Media, Inc.. Responses due by 12/5/2016. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bradberry, Kevin)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER granting #21 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by E. Adam Webb. James B. Durham has entered an appearance in this case and vouches that he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel as required by this Court's Local Rule 83.4. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on November 10, 2016. (pmh)
November 7, 2016 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number 113J-2070154, Fee Amount $200, by T.A.N.. Responses due by 11/25/2016. (Durham, James)
November 7, 2016 MOTIONS REFERRED: #21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number 113J-2070154, Fee Amount $200. (ca)
November 2, 2016 Filing 20 Clerk's ORDER granting #19 Motion Clerk's Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #16 MOTION to Remand to State Cour.t Responses due by 11/17/2016. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 11/2/2016. Modified on 11/2/2016 (ca).
November 2, 2016 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court (LR 6.1 Extension by Clerk) by PNI Digital Media, Inc.. Responses due by 11/21/2016. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bradberry, Kevin)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting #17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time. Defendant shall have up to and including December 30, 2016, to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on October 28, 2016. (pmh)
October 26, 2016 Filing 17 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by PNI Digital Media, Inc.. Responses due by 11/14/2016. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bradberry, Kevin)
October 26, 2016 MOTIONS REFERRED: #17 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (ca)
October 19, 2016 Filing 16 MOTION to Remand to State Court by T.A.N.. Responses due by 11/7/2016. (Durham, James)
October 18, 2016 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by James B. Durham on behalf of T.A.N. (Durham, James)
October 3, 2016 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #1 Notice of Removal, Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice has not bee submitted. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 10/17/2016. (ca)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Sam A. Camardo. Kevin D. Bradberry has entered an appearance in this case and vouches that he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel as required by this Court's Local Rule 83.4. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on September 27, 2016. (pmh)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by James A. Slater. Kevin D. Bradberry has entered an appearance in this case and vouches that he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel as required by this Court's Local Rule 83.4. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on September 27, 2016. (pmh)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Daniel R. Warren. Kevin D. Bradberry has entered an appearance in this case and vouches that he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel as required by this Court's Local Rule 83.4. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on September 27, 2016. (pmh)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time. Defendant PNI Digital Media, Inc. shall have up to an including October 31, 2016, to answer, or otherwise respond, to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on September 27, 2016. (pmh)
September 27, 2016 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Sam A. Camardo Receipt Number 113J-2050529, Fee Amount $200, by PNI Digital Media, Inc.. Responses due by 10/14/2016. (Bradberry, Kevin)
September 27, 2016 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice James A. Slater Receipt Number 113J-2050520, Fee Amount $200, by PNI Digital Media, Inc.. Responses due by 10/14/2016. (Bradberry, Kevin)
September 27, 2016 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Daniel R. Warren Receipt Number 113J-2050517, Fee Amount $200, by PNI Digital Media, Inc.. Responses due by 10/14/2016. (Bradberry, Kevin)
September 27, 2016 MOTIONS REFERRED: #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Sam A. Camardo Receipt Number 113J-2050529, Fee Amount $200, #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice James A. Slater Receipt Number 113J-2050520, Fee Amount $200, #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Daniel R. Warren Receipt Number 113J-2050517, Fee Amount $200. (ca)
September 22, 2016 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (ca)
September 21, 2016 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by PNI Digital Media, Inc.. Responses due by 10/11/2016. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bradberry, Kevin)
September 20, 2016 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing by PNI Digital Media, Inc. of Notice of Removal in Glynn County Superior Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Glynn County Filing)(Bradberry, Kevin)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 9/19/2016. (ca)
September 19, 2016 Filing 3 NOTICE to all Counsel of Record re #1 Notice of Removal, the parties are notified to re-file and pending motions (previously filed in State Court), and responses, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this notice. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 10/3/2016. (ca)
September 19, 2016 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by PNI Digital Media, Inc. (ca)
September 19, 2016 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PNI Digital Media, Inc. from Superior Court of Glynn County, Georgia, case number 16-00906-063. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113J-2046000). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Class Action Complaint Superior Court of Glynn County, #2 Exhibit B-Class Action Complaint Atlanta Divison dated 9/15/16, #3 Exhibit C-Ameded Class Action Complaint Western District of Washington at Seattle, #4 Exhibit D-Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, Western District of Washington at Seattle, #5 Exhibit E-Delcaration of Janice Amato, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca)
September 19, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: PNI Digital Media, Inc. answer due 9/26/2016. (ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: T.A.N. v. PNI Digital Media, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNI Digital Media, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Daniel Bradberry
Represented By: Sam A. Camardo
Represented By: Daniel R. Warren
Represented By: James A. Slater
Represented By: Paul G. Karlsgodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.A.N.
Represented By: James B. Durham
Represented By: Edward Adam Webb
Represented By: William S. Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?