Peh v. Keliher et al

Plaintiff: Ee Meng Peh
Defendant: Trent V. Keliher, Kenneth R. Teagle and Ayer Rajah Investments, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv00139
Filed: October 14, 2016
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Brunswick Office
County: Glynn
Referring Judge: R. Stan Baker
Presiding Judge: Lisa G. Wood
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 1, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 27 Report and Recommendations of the Magistrate Judge as the opinion of the Court. The Court DISMISSES without prejudice Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Trent V. Keliher and Kenneth R. Teagle. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Ayer Rajah Investments, LLC, shall remain pending. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 8/31/2017. (ca)
July 28, 2017 27 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that the Court DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE all claims against Defendants Trent V. Keliher and Kenneth R. Teagle re: 1 Complaint. Any party seeking to object to this Report and Recommendation is ord ered to file specific written objections within fourteen (14) days of the date on which this Report and Recommendation is entered. (Objections to R&R due by 8/11/2017). ORDER directing service of the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 7/28/2017. (csr)
May 25, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant Ayer Rajah's 20 Motion to Stay and Extension to Meet Deadlines. Counsel shall update the Court of the status of service of the Complaint within twenty-one days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 5/25/2017. (csr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peh v. Keliher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ee Meng Peh
Represented By: Jonathan Rigdon Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trent V. Keliher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth R. Teagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ayer Rajah Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?