Moseley v. Lynch
Plaintiff: Cary G. Moseley, Jr.
Defendant: Loretta Lynch
Case Number: 2:2016cv00153
Filed: November 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Brunswick Office
County: Ware
Presiding Judge: R. Stan Baker
Presiding Judge: Lisa G. Wood
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting Defendant's 20 Motion to Dismiss, and Plaintiff's claims are dismissed. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 11/17/2017. (ca)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 34 Objection/Motion for Reconsideration, and the 31 Order dated 5/1/17, remains the Order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 5/25/2017. (ca)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER VACATING the 10 Report and Recommendations and Order issued 1/23/2017. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to terminate Ms. Loretta Lynch as a Defendant and SUBSTITUTE Dana Boente, in his Official Capacity as Attorney General of the U.S., as the sole Defendant in this case. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to issue the undersigned's standard Rule 26 Instruction Order in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 2/6/2017. (ca)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that the Court DISMISS this action WITHOUT PREJUDICE and DIRECT the Clerk to enter the appropriate judgment of dismissal and to CLOSE this case re 8 Amended Complaint, filed by Cary G. Moseley, Jr . The Court ORDERS any party seeking to object to this Report and Recommendation to file specific written objections within fourteen (14) days of the date on which this Report and Recommendation is entered (Objections to R&R due by 1/27/2017). ORDER directing service of the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 1/13/2017. (ca)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moseley v. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cary G. Moseley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loretta Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?