King v. Marcy et al
Plaintiff: Roxanne King
Defendant: Parker Marcy, John Doe and Jane Doe
Case Number: 2:2017cv00112
Filed: September 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Brunswick Office
County: Glynn
Presiding Judge: R. Stan Baker
Presiding Judge: Lisa G. Wood
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 JUDGMENT entered granting Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. This action stands closed. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 9/23/19. (loh)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting re 56 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 73 Motion to Dismiss Eric Butler as a Defendant. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to enter the appropriate judgment of dismissal and to CLOSE this case. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 9/19/19. (loh)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER denying re 71 Motion for Clarification of 68 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 2/28/19. (loh)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER denying re 24 Motion to Dismiss; denying re 33 Motion to Dismiss; denying re 42 Motion to Dismiss; denying re 47 Motion to Strike; denying re 47 Motion for Default Judgment. The Court ORDERS Plaintiffs to file a comprehensive operativ e complaint entitled "Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint," as outlined in Section 1 of this Order, within seven days of this Order. Plaintiffs are to identify each Defendant by his or her first and last name, including Defendants who did not raise this issue in a motion. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 2/19/19. (loh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Marcy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxanne King
Represented By: W. Douglas Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker Marcy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?