United States of America et al v. Miracle Home Care, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: State of Georgia and United States of America
Defendant: Shashicka Tyre-Hill, Miracle Home Care, Inc., Miracle Transportation, Darlene Jackson and Miracle Adult Day Care, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00078
Filed: June 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Brunswick Office
County: Glynn
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
2 Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER that any and all civil cases pending in this district in which the United States, any of its federal agencies, or any of its officers and/or employees is a named party is hereby stayed until Congress has restored appropriations to the Department of Justice. Further, any and all civil cases pending in this district in which the United States Attorney or any Assistant United States Attorney is counsel of record, is hereby stayed until Congress has restored appropriations to the Department of Justice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall, Judge Dudley H. Bowen, Jr., Judge William T. Moore, Jr., Judge Lisa G. Wood, and Judge R. Stan Baker on 1/11/2019. (csr)
November 14, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 11/15/2018 11:00 AM in Brunswick - Courtroom No. 1 - before Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. is cancelled until further notice by the Court. (km)
November 14, 2018 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro: Telephonic Status Conference held on 11/14/2018. Settlement conference set for 11/15/2018 is CANCELLED. (km)
November 13, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendants' #11 Counterclaims by State of Georgia. Responses due by 11/27/2018. (Mooney, James) Modified on 11/14/2018 (csr).
November 13, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' #11 Counterclaims by United States of America. Responses due by 11/27/2018. (Porter, Jonathan) Modified on 11/14/2018 (csr).
October 17, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 11/15/2018 11:00 AM in Brunswick - Courtroom No. 1 - before Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (csr)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. The Court hereby ORDERS that this matter is set for a Settlement Conference on Thursday, November 15, 2018, at 11:00 AM, in Courtroom 1, at the United States District Courthouse, 801 Gloucester Street, Brunswick, Georgia. To facilitate this process, the Court hereby STAYS all deadlines UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT. Each party shall provide to the Undersigned, in confidence, through the Undersigned's Courtroom Deputy, a concise settlement statement of the evidence the party expects to produce at trial no later than three (3) business days before the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 10/17/2018. (csr)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/9/2018. Discovery due by 2/13/2019. Motions due by 5/17/2019. Pretrial Order due by 7/16/2019. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 3/27/2019. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 3/27/2019. Status Report due by 4/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 10/11/2018. (csr)
October 10, 2018 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro: Telephonic Status Conference held on 10/10/2018. (km)
October 3, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephonic Status Conference originally scheduled for 10/3/2018 is RESCHEDULED for 10/10/2018 03:00 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. Courtroom Deputy Clerk to provide dial-in instructions to counsel. (km)
September 27, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/3/2018 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. Dial-In Instructions will be provided to counsel by Courtroom Deputy Clerk. (km)
September 25, 2018 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Porter, Jonathan)
September 12, 2018 Filing 14 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Darlene Jackson. (Garland, Edward)
September 12, 2018 Filing 13 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Miracle Adult Day Care, Inc., Miracle Home Care, Inc., Miracle Transportation, and Shashicka Tyre-Hill. (Garland, Edward)
September 12, 2018 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Darlene Jackson, Miracle Adult Day Care, Inc., Miracle Home Care, Inc., Miracle Transportation, and Shashicka Tyre-Hill. (Garland, Edward)
September 11, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint and COUNTERCLAIM against State of Georgia, United States of America by Miracle Transportation, Darlene Jackson, Miracle Home Care, Inc., Shashicka Tyre-Hill, Miracle Adult Day Care, Inc. (Garland, Edward) Modified on 9/12/2018 (csr).
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting the parties' second #9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendants shall have through September 11, 2018 to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 9/6/2018. (csr)
September 5, 2018 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro pursuant to standing Order in 1:18-mc-12. Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker no longer assigned to the case. (csr)
September 4, 2018 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Clerk's Extension of Time to File Answer by Darlene Jackson, Miracle Adult Day Care, Inc., Miracle Home Care, Inc., Miracle Transportation, Shashicka Tyre-Hill. Responses due by 9/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Garland, Edward) Modified on 9/4/2018 (csr).
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Clerk's Extension of Time to File Answer. Darlene Jackson answer due 9/4/2018; Miracle Adult Day Care, Inc. answer due 9/4/2018; Miracle Home Care, Inc. answer due 9/4/2018; Miracle Transportation answer due 9/4/2018; Shashicka Tyre-Hill answer due 9/4/2018. Deputy Clerk on 8/29/2018. (csr)
August 29, 2018 Motions No Longer Referred: #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (csr)
August 29, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (csr)
August 28, 2018 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Clerk's Extension of Time to File Answer by Darlene Jackson, Miracle Adult Day Care, Inc., Miracle Home Care, Inc., Miracle Transportation, Shashicka Tyre-Hill. Responses due by 9/11/2018. (Garland, Edward) Modified on 8/29/2018 (csr).
August 28, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward T.M. Garland on behalf of Darlene Jackson, Miracle Adult Day Care, Inc., Miracle Home Care, Inc., Miracle Transportation, and Shashicka Tyre-Hill. (Garland, Edward) Modified on 8/28/2018 (csr).
June 29, 2018 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE filed by United States of America. All Defendants. (Porter, Jonathan) Modified on 7/2/2018 (csr).
June 28, 2018 Filing 4 Litigants' Bill of Rights by United States of America. (Porter, Jonathan)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 6/28/2018. (ca)
June 28, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Darlene Jackson, Miracle Adult Day Care, Inc., Miracle Home Care, Inc., Miracle Transportation, Shashicka Tyre-Hill. (ca)
June 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America, State of Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. Miracle Home Care, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shashicka Tyre-Hill
Represented By: Edward T.M. Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miracle Home Care, Inc.
Represented By: Edward T.M. Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miracle Transportation
Represented By: Edward T.M. Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darlene Jackson
Represented By: Edward T.M. Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miracle Adult Day Care, Inc.
Represented By: Edward T.M. Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Georgia
Represented By: Christopher Michael Carr
Represented By: James Philip Mooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jonathan Alan Porter
Represented By: James Philip Mooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?