Brinkley et al v. Waters et al
Plaintiff: Jared Spell and Ashton Brinkley
Defendant: Dr. Gene A. Starr, Dr. Scarlett M. Copeland, Wanda L. Waters, John/Jane Does, James Carol Waters, Michael Glenn Waters, Appling County School District and Violet Marchman
Case Number: 2:2018cv00089
Filed: July 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Brunswick Office
County: Appling
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
2 Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2018 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro pursuant to standing Order in 1:18-mc-12. Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker no longer assigned to the case. (csr)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 09/05/2018. (WS)
August 28, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jared Spell. Fee Amount $200, 113J-2436919. Responses due by 9/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 List of Cases, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(ca)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Melvin Leroy Hewitt. Charles J. Bowen has entered an appearance in this case and vouches that he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel as required by this Court's Local Rule 83.4. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on August 24, 2018. (km)
August 21, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing by Ashton Brinkley, Jared Spell re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Corrected Attachment C, #2 Corrected Attachment D)(Bowen, Charles)
August 21, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Requested by Melvin Leroy Hewitt, Esquire. (csr)
August 21, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Requested by Melvin Leroy Hewitt, Esquire. $200.00 Filing Fee Paid - Receipt Number 113J-2433001, filed by Ashton Brinkley, Jared Spell. Responses due by 9/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bowen, Charles). Modified on 8/21/2018 (csr).
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 7/18/18. (slt)
July 18, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Appling Co. School District Summons, #2 Copeland Summons, #3 Marchman Summons, #4 J. Waters Summons, #5 W. Waters Summons, #6 Starr Summons)(slt)
July 18, 2018 Filing 3 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Ashton Brinkley, Jared Spell. (slt)
July 18, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Ashton Brinkley, Jared Spell. (slt)
July 18, 2018 Filing fee paid: $400, receipt number 113J-2413060. (slt)
July 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jared Spell, Ashton Brinkley. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B, #3 Attachment C, #4 Attachment D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(slt) Modified on 8/21/2018. See Notice #7 for corrected attachments C and D. (slt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brinkley et al v. Waters et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Gene A. Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Scarlett M. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wanda L. Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Carol Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Glenn Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Appling County School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Violet Marchman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Spell
Represented By: Charles J. Bowen
Represented By: Jarome E. Gautreaux
Represented By: Melvin Leroy Hewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashton Brinkley
Represented By: Charles J. Bowen
Represented By: Jarome E. Gautreaux
Represented By: Melvin Leroy Hewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?