Carter v. 3M et al
Plaintiff: Sheila B. Carter
Defendant: Warren Pumps, Inc., Gorman-Rupp Company, Goulds Pumps, Incorporated, IMO Industries Inc., A. W. Chesterton Company, ITT Corporation, Industrial Holdings Corporation, Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc., Grinnell LLC, Certainteed Corporation, General Electric Company, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Uniroyal Holdings, Inc., Bayer Cropscience, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Crane Co., CBS Corporation, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company and 3M
Case Number: 2:2018cv00100
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Brunswick Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
2 Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER approving the #72 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. Accordingly, all claims asserted against Defendant A.W. Chesterton Company in this action are dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own fees and costs. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate A.W. Chesterton Company as a defendant. All other claims asserted in this action remain pending. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 10/18/2018. (ca)
October 17, 2018 Filing 72 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant A.W. Chesteron Company ONLY by Sheila B. Carter. (Suthers, John)
September 28, 2018 Filing 71 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by 3M. (Marsh, Gary)
September 28, 2018 Filing 70 Litigants' Bill of Rights by 3M. (Marsh, Gary)
September 28, 2018 Filing 69 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Memorandum of Law In Support by 3M. Responses due by 10/12/2018. (Marsh, Gary)
September 28, 2018 Filing 68 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc.. (York, Peter)
September 28, 2018 Filing 67 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc.. (York, Peter)
September 28, 2018 Filing 66 ANSWER to Complaint by Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc..(York, Peter) Modified on 9/28/2018 (ca).
September 28, 2018 Filing 65 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc.. (Young, H.) Document restricted. Pleading was improperly efiled. Counsel will refile. Modified on 9/28/2018 (slt).
September 28, 2018 Filing 64 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc. (Young, H.) Document restricted. Pleading was improperly efiled. Counsel will refile. Modified on 9/28/2018 (slt).
September 28, 2018 Filing 63 ANSWER to Complaint by Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc.(Young, H.) Modified on 9/28/2018 (ca). Modified on 9/28/2018. Document restricted. Pleading was improperly efiled. Counsel will refile. (slt)
September 28, 2018 Filing 62 Litigants' Bill of Rights by ITT Corporation. (Mapen, Jeffrey)
September 28, 2018 Filing 61 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by ITT Corporation. (Mapen, Jeffrey)
September 28, 2018 Filing 60 ANSWER to Complaint by ITT Corporation.(Mapen, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2018 Filing 59 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Gorman-Rupp Company. (Shofner, Erin)
September 27, 2018 Filing 58 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Gorman-Rupp Company. (Shofner, Erin)
September 27, 2018 Filing 57 ANSWER to Complaint by Gorman-Rupp Company.(Shofner, Erin)
September 27, 2018 Filing 56 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Warren Pumps, Inc.. (Peters, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2018 Filing 55 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Warren Pumps, Inc.. (Peters, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2018 Filing 54 ANSWER to Complaint by Warren Pumps, Inc..(Peters, Jeffrey) Modified on 9/27/2018 (ca).
September 25, 2018 Filing 53 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Industrial Holdings Corporation. (Shofner, Erin)
September 25, 2018 Filing 52 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Industrial Holdings Corporation. (Shofner, Erin)
September 25, 2018 Filing 51 ANSWER to Complaint by Industrial Holdings Corporation.(Shofner, Erin)
September 24, 2018 Filing 50 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Sheila B. Carter. (Suthers, John)
September 24, 2018 Filing 49 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Sheila B. Carter. (Suthers, John)
September 21, 2018 Filing 48 ANSWER to Complaint by Grinnell LLC.(Mapen, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2018 Filing 47 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Grinnell LLC. (Mapen, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2018 Filing 46 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Grinnell LLC. (Mapen, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2018 Filing 44 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Crane Co.. (Mapen, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2018 Filing 43 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Crane Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Exhibit 21 to Crane Co.'s Form 10K)(Mapen, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2018 Filing 42 ANSWER to Complaint by Crane Co..(Mapen, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Frances Laura Spinelli on behalf of CBS Corporation, General Electric Company, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Uniroyal Holdings, Inc. (Spinelli, Frances)
September 20, 2018 Filing 40 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Bayer Cropscience, Inc.. (Sandick, Philip)
September 20, 2018 Filing 39 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Bayer Cropscience, Inc.. (Sandick, Philip)
September 20, 2018 Filing 38 ANSWER to Complaint by Bayer Cropscience, Inc..(Sandick, Philip)
September 20, 2018 Filing 37 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Union Carbide Corporation. (Sandick, Philip)
September 20, 2018 Filing 36 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Union Carbide Corporation. (Sandick, Philip)
September 20, 2018 Filing 35 ANSWER to Complaint by Union Carbide Corporation.(Sandick, Philip)
September 20, 2018 Filing 34 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by General Electric Company. (Gustafson, Ivan)
September 20, 2018 Filing 33 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Gustafson, Ivan)
September 20, 2018 Filing 32 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by CBS Corporation. (Gustafson, Ivan)
September 20, 2018 Filing 31 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Uniroyal Holdings, Inc.. (Gustafson, Ivan)
September 20, 2018 Filing 30 Litigants' Bill of Rights by General Electric Company. (Gustafson, Ivan)
September 20, 2018 Filing 29 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Gustafson, Ivan)
September 20, 2018 Filing 28 Litigants' Bill of Rights by CBS Corporation. (Gustafson, Ivan)
September 20, 2018 Filing 27 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Uniroyal Holdings, Inc.. (Gustafson, Ivan)
September 20, 2018 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint by General Electric Company.(Gustafson, Ivan)
September 20, 2018 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint by Ingersoll-Rand Company.(Gustafson, Ivan)
September 20, 2018 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint by CBS Corporation.(Gustafson, Ivan)
September 20, 2018 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint by Uniroyal Holdings, Inc..(Gustafson, Ivan)
September 20, 2018 Filing 22 Litigants' Bill of Rights by IMO Industries Inc.. (Peters, Jeffrey)
September 20, 2018 Filing 21 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Benjamin, Vonnetta)
September 20, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company of Alternative Dispute Resolution and Case Management Procedures (Benjamin, Vonnetta)
September 20, 2018 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company.(Benjamin, Vonnetta)
September 19, 2018 Filing 18 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Goulds Pumps, Incorporated. (Mapen, Jeffrey)
September 19, 2018 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Goulds Pumps, Incorporated. (Mapen, Jeffrey)
September 19, 2018 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint by Goulds Pumps, Incorporated.(Mapen, Jeffrey)
September 19, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Garner Sanford, Jr on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Sanford, C.)
September 19, 2018 Filing 14 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Donohue, Luke)
September 19, 2018 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Donohue, Luke)
September 19, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Donohue, Luke)
September 18, 2018 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by IMO Industries Inc.. (Peters, Jeffrey)
September 18, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by IMO Industries Inc..(Peters, Jeffrey) Modified on 9/18/2018 (ca).
September 18, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to A. W. Chesterton Company. (ca)
September 18, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Submitted (Suthers, John)
September 14, 2018 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by John E. Guerry, III. John E. Suthers has entered an appearance in this case and vouches that he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel as required by this Court's Local Rule 83.4. Signed by Magistrate Benjamin W. Cheesbro on September 14, 2018. (km)
September 11, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John E. Guerry, III. (ca)
September 5, 2018 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro pursuant to standing Order in 1:18-mc-12. Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker no longer assigned to the case. (ca)
September 4, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John E. Guerry, III Receipt Number 113J-2440687, Fee Amount $200, by Sheila B. Carter. Responses due by 9/18/2018. (Suthers, John)
August 21, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Goulds Pumps, Incorporated, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (ca)
August 21, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Submitted (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Suthers, John)
August 21, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 summons, #3 summons, #4 summons, #5 summons, #6 summons, #7 summons, #8 summons, #9 summons, #10 summons, #11 summons, #12 summons, #13 summons, #14 summons, #15 summons, #16 summons, #17 summons, #18 summons, #19 summons)(slt)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 8/21/2018. (ca)
August 21, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: John E. Guerry III has up to and including 9/4/2018 to comply with Pro Hac Vice requirements. (slt)
August 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Sheila B. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(slt)
August 20, 2018 Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number 113J-2432529. (slt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. 3M et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gorman-Rupp Company
Represented By: Erin Elaine Shofner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Incorporated
Represented By: Jeffrey Lyle Mapen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. W. Chesterton Company
Represented By: Frances Laura Spinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey Lyle Mapen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Holdings Corporation
Represented By: Erin Elaine Shofner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc.
Represented By: Peter R. York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Lyle Mapen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certainteed Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Ivan A. Gustafson
Represented By: Frances Laura Spinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Ivan A. Gustafson
Represented By: Frances Laura Spinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uniroyal Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Ivan A. Gustafson
Represented By: Frances Laura Spinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Cropscience, Inc.
Represented By: Philip Aaron Sandick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: C. Garner Sanford, Jr.
Represented By: Luke Donohue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Philip Aaron Sandick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Jeffrey Lyle Mapen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Ivan A. Gustafson
Represented By: Frances Laura Spinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: Vonnetta L. Benjamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M
Represented By: Gary W. Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila B. Carter
Represented By: John E. Guerry, III
Represented By: John E. Suthers
Represented By: David Adam Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?