Santos et al v. Carter et al
Plaintiff: Miriam Tapari and Marilyn Santos
Defendant: Raymond Lee Dyals, Camden County Sheriff's Office, Christopher Joseph Prosen, Jim Proctor and Devon William Carter
Case Number: 2:2018cv00114
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. (slt)
November 19, 2018 Filing 36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Marilyn Santos, Miriam Tapari. Responses due by 12/3/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fields, Lazaro) Modified on 11/20/2018 (slt).
November 15, 2018 Filing 35 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Christopher Joseph Prosen. (Massee, Jacob)
November 15, 2018 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss by Christopher Joseph Prosen. Responses due by 11/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of Order from Willis v. McKoon)(Massee, Jacob)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Christopher Joseph Prosen answer due 11/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 11/15/2018. (ca)
November 13, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley J. Watkins on behalf of Devon William Carter (Watkins, Bradley)
November 13, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard K. Strickland on behalf of Devon William Carter (Strickland, Richard)
November 13, 2018 Filing 30 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Devon William Carter. (Strickland, Richard)
November 13, 2018 Filing 29 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's Complaint by Devon William Carter. (Strickland, Richard)
November 9, 2018 Filing 28 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Christopher Joseph Prosen. Responses due by 11/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Massee, Jacob)
November 9, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #28 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (slt)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Clerk's Extension of Time (LR 6.1) to file Litigant's Bill of Rights. Defendants Dyals, Sheriff Proctor, and Camden County Sheriffs Office shall file their Litigant's Bill of Rights on or before November 21, 2018. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 11/8/18. (slt) Modified on 11/9/2018 (slt).
November 8, 2018 Motions No Longer Referred: #25 Motion for Clerks Extension of Time (LR 6.1). (slt)
November 7, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley Calvin Jackson on behalf of Camden County Sheriff's Office, Raymond Lee Dyals, Jim Proctor (Jackson, Wesley)
November 7, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to COMPLETE LITIGANT'S BILL OF RIGHTS , by Camden County Sheriff's Office, Raymond Lee Dyals, Jim Proctor. Responses due by 11/21/2018. (Choy, Sun) Modified on 11/8/2018 (slt).
November 7, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support by Camden County Sheriff's Office, Raymond Lee Dyals, and Jim Proctor. Responses due by 11/21/2018. (Choy, Sun) Modified on 11/7/2018 (csr).
November 7, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #25 MOTION for Extension of Time to COMPLETE LITIGANT'S BILL OF RIGHTS. (slt) Modified on 11/9/2018 (jlh).
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Camden County Sheriff's Office, Raymond Lee Dyals, and Jim Proctor answers due 11/7/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 11/2/18. (slt)
October 31, 2018 Filing 22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Camden County Sheriff's Office, Raymond Lee Dyals and Jim Proctor. Responses due by 11/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Choy, Sun) Modified on 11/7/2018 (csr).
October 31, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. (slt)
October 22, 2018 Filing 21 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Devon William Carter. (Williams, Nathan)
October 22, 2018 Filing 20 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Devon William Carter. (Williams, Nathan)
October 22, 2018 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint by Devon William Carter.(Williams, Nathan)
October 11, 2018 Filing 18 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Marilyn Santos, and Miriam Tapari. (Bonner, William) Modified on 10/12/2018 (csr).
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lazaro Fields. W. Allen Bonner has entered an appearance in this case and vouches that he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel as required by this Court's Local Rule 83.4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on October 11, 2018. (edd)
October 10, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lazaro Fields Receipt Number 113J-2462115, Fee Amount $200, by Marilyn Santos, Miriam Tapari. Responses due by 10/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Order of Admission)(Bonner, William)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Clerk's Extension of Time (LR 6.1). Plaintiff shall file their Litigant's Bill of Rights on or before 10/23/18. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/10/2018. (ca)
October 10, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lazaro Fields. (csr)
October 9, 2018 Filing 14 First Motion for Clerks Extension of Time (LR 6.1) to File Litigant's Bill of Rights by Marilyn Santos, Miriam Tapari. Responses due by 10/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Casey, Stephanie)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph J. Kalbac, Jr. W. Allen Bonner has entered an appearance in this case and vouches that he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel as required by this Courts Local Rule 83.4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on October 5, 2018. (edd)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Francisco R. Maderal. W. Allen Bonner has entered an appearance in this case and vouches that he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel as required by this Courts Local Rule 83.4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on October 5, 2018. (edd)
October 4, 2018 Filing 11 MOTIONS REFERRED: #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joseph J. Kalbac, Jr. and #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Francisco R. Maderal. (slt)
October 4, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joseph J. Kalbac, Jr. Receipt Number 113J-2459104, Fee Amount $200, by Marilyn Santos, Miriam Tapari. Responses due by 10/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Order of Admission)(Bonner, William)
October 4, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Francisco R. Maderal Receipt Number 113J-2459062, Fee Amount $200, by Marilyn Santos, Miriam Tapari. Responses due by 10/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Order of Admission)(Bonner, William)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Darren J. Rousso. W. Allen Bonner has entered an appearance in this case and vouches that he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel as required by this Courts Local Rule 83.4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on October 1, 2018. (edd)
October 1, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Darren J. Rousso, by Marilyn Santos, Miriam Tapari. Receipt Number 113J-2456515, Fee Amount $200. Responses due by 10/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Order of Admission)(Bonner, William) Modified on 10/1/2018 (slt).
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Stephanie A. Casey. W. Allen Bonner has entered an appearance in this case and vouches that he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel as required by this Courts Local Rule 83.4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on October 1, 2018. (edd)
October 1, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stephanie A. Casey. (slt)
September 28, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stephanie A. Casey, by Marilyn Santos, Miriam Tapari. Receipt Number 113J-2455896, Fee Amount $200. Responses due by 10/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bonner, William) Modified on 10/1/2018 (slt).
September 24, 2018 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Marilyn Santos. (Bonner, William)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 9/24/18. (slt)
September 24, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (ca)
September 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Marilyn Santos, Miriam Tapari. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca)
September 24, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 113J-2452325. (ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santos et al v. Carter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Lee Dyals
Represented By: Wesley Calvin Jackson
Represented By: Sun S. Choy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camden County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: Wesley Calvin Jackson
Represented By: Sun S. Choy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Joseph Prosen
Represented By: Jacob D. Massee
Represented By: Patrick T. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Proctor
Represented By: Wesley Calvin Jackson
Represented By: Sun S. Choy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devon William Carter
Represented By: Nathan T. Williams
Represented By: Bradley J. Watkins
Represented By: Richard K. Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miriam Tapari
Represented By: William Allen Bonner
Represented By: Joseph J. Kalbac
Represented By: Stephanie A. Casey
Represented By: Francisco R. Maderal
Represented By: Lazaro Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Santos
Represented By: William Allen Bonner
Represented By: Joseph J. Kalbac
Represented By: Stephanie A. Casey
Represented By: Francisco R. Maderal
Represented By: Lazaro Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?