COUNTRY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY v. Roberts et al

Plaintiff: COUNTRY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: Brady King and Brittany Roberts
Case Number: 2:2018cv00116
Filed: September 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
0 Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
1 Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Intradistrict Transfer to Savannah Division (4:18-cv-230). (slt)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Change Venue. Case is transferred from Brunswick Division to Savannah Division. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 9/28/18. (slt)
September 26, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Change Venue (Transfer to the Savannah Division) by COUNTRY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. Responses due by 10/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Traynham, Jay)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 9/25/18. (slt)
September 25, 2018 Filing fee: $400, receipt number 113J-2453510. (slt)
September 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against Brady King, Brittany Roberts, filed by COUNTRY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY.(slt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/25/2018: #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C Part 1, #5 Exhibit C Part 2, #6 Exhibit C Part 3, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (slt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COUNTRY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY v. Roberts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brady King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brittany Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COUNTRY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Amanda Rodman Smith
Represented By: Jay C. Traynham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?