The State of Georgia, et al v. Base Services of Athens, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: The State of Georgia and Base Services of Athens, Inc.
Defendant: Richard V. Spencer and The United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv00045
Filed: April 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting Defendants' #28 Motion to Stay. All deadlines in this action are stayed until further order of this Court. The Parties remain obligated to notify the Court by notice on the docket as soon as they become aware that the arbitration proceeding initiated by GVRA pursuant to the RSA is concluded. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 6/4/2019. (csr)
June 4, 2019 Motions No Longer Referred: #28 MOTION to Stay. (csr)
June 4, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #28 MOTION to Stay. (ca)
June 3, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Stay by Richard V. Spencer, The United States of America. Responses due by 6/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Leithart, Otto)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and granting #9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Defendants are enjoined from proceeding with procurement under Solicitation No. N68836-18-Q-0009 until such time as the arbitration proceeding initiated by GVRA pursuant to the RSA is concluded. Defendants are enjoined from (i) making any award decision pursuant to Solicitation No. N68836-18-Q-0009, (ii) entering into a contract under Solicitation No. N68836-18-Q-0009, and commencing performance of such contract. Defendants are directed to maintain their contractual relationship with BSA through a bridge contract until such time as the arbitration proceeding initiated by GVRA pursuant to the RSA is concluded. Any such bridge contract shall not be less than $128,855 per month nor exceed $130,000 per month. All parties are directed to notify the Court as soon as they become aware that the arbitration proceeding initiated by GVRA pursuant to the RSA is concluded. This Preliminary Injunction shall remain in effect until the Court receives such record notice. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 5/30/19. (slt)
May 21, 2019 Filing 26 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Leithart, Otto)
May 21, 2019 Filing 25 Proposed Findings of Fact by Richard V. Spencer, The United States of America. (Leithart, Otto)
May 21, 2019 Filing 24 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Base Services of Athens, Inc., The State of Georgia. (Nolan, Peter) Modified on 5/22/2019 (slt).
May 17, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 05/15/2019, before Judge Lisa Godbey Wood. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debbie Gilbert, Telephone number (912) 262-2608. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. (Transcript Redaction Policy Issued or Click here to view <) Redaction Request due 6/7/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/17/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/15/2019. (Gilbert, Debra)
May 15, 2019 Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lisa G. Wood: Motion Hearing held on 5/15/2019 re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by The State of Georgia. (Court Reporter Debbie Gilbert.) (WS)
May 14, 2019 Filing 21 SUR REPLY re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Richard V. Spencer, The United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DoD Instruction 1125.03)(Leithart, Otto)
May 10, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Base Services of Athens, Inc., The State of Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - DoDD Excerpt, #2 Exhibit B - GAO Publication Excerpt)(Nolan, Peter)
May 3, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The State of Georgia. (Nolan, Peter)
May 3, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The State of Georgia. (Nolan, Peter)
May 3, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The State of Georgia. Richard V. Spencer served on 4/3/2019, answer due 6/2/2019. (Nolan, Peter)
May 3, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The State of Georgia. The United States of America served on 4/3/2019, answer due 6/2/2019. (Nolan, Peter)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave of Absence by Todd C. Brooks for the dates of May 24, 2019 through and including May 31, 2019; June 24, 2019 through and including July 5, 2019; November 22, 2019 through and including November 29, 2019; and December 20, 2019 through and including January 1, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on April 30, 2019. (edd)
April 30, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 5/15/2019 01:00 PM in Brunswick - Courtroom No. 1 - before Judge Lisa G. Wood. (WS)
April 29, 2019 Filing 13 First MOTION for Leave of Absence as to The State of Georgia for dates of : May 24, 2019 to May 31, 2019, June 24, 2019 to July 5, 2019, November 22, 2019 to November 29, 2019, December 20, 2019 to January 2, 2020 by The State of Georgia. Responses due by 5/13/2019. (Catts, Austin)
April 29, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #13 First MOTION for Leave of Absence as to The State of Georgia for dates of : May 24, 2019 to May 31, 2019, June 24, 2019 to July 5, 2019, November 22, 2019 to November 29, 2019, December 20, 2019 to January 2, 2020. (slt)
April 23, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Richard V. Spencer, The United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exh. A - Heard Declaration, #2 Exh. B - McClendon Declaration, #3 Exh. C - Solicitation N68836-18-Q-0099, #4 Exh. D - Gunter Declaration)(Leithart, Otto)
April 16, 2019 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by The United States of America. (Leithart, Otto)
April 9, 2019 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lisa G. Wood: Telephonic Status Conference held on 4/9/2019. (Court Reporter Debbie Gilbert.) (WS)
April 9, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/16/2019. (slt)
April 5, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by The State of Georgia. Responses due by 4/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Charlie Garrett Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Don James Declaration)(Nolan, Peter)
April 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Otto Woelke Leithart on behalf of All Defendants (Leithart, Otto)
April 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 4/9/2019 02:30 PM in L G Wood Chambers before Judge Lisa G. Wood. (Attachments: #1 Dial-in Instructions)(WS)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Peter A. Nolan. Austin Catts has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on April 4, 2019. (edd)
April 4, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (slt)
April 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number 113J-2574984, Fee Amount $200, by The State of Georgia. Responses due by 4/17/2019. (Catts, Austin)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 4/3/19. (slt)
April 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (csr)
April 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunctive Relief, filed by Base Services of Athens, Inc., and The State of Georgia. (csr)
April 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by The State of Georgia, and Base Services of Athens, Inc. $400.00 Filing Fee Paid - Receipt Number: 113J-2572172. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (csr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The State of Georgia, et al v. Base Services of Athens, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Georgia
Represented By: Austin E. Catts
Represented By: Peter A. Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Base Services of Athens, Inc.
Represented By: Austin E. Catts
Represented By: Peter A. Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard V. Spencer
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?