Butler v. Northpointe Hospitality Management, LLC
Plaintiff: Adniqua Butler
Defendant: Northpointe Hospitality Management, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00053
Filed: April 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Adniqua Butler. (Smith, Ian)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Northpointe Hospitality Management, LLC identifying Northpointe Hospitality Management, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (Mocek, Joyce)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Northpointe Hospitality Management, LLC.(Freesmeier, Hillary)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. Northpointe Hospitality Management, LLC answer due 6/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 6/12/2019. (ca)
June 10, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (ca)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Northpointe Hospitality Management, LLC. Responses due by 6/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Freesmeier, Hillary)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Hillary L. Freesmeier on behalf of Northpointe Hospitality Management, LLC (Freesmeier, Hillary)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adniqua Butler. Northpointe Hospitality Management, LLC served on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019. (Smith, Ian)
April 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Northpointe Hospitality Management, LLC. (csr)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 4/22/2019. (csr)
April 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Northpointe Hospitality Management, LLC, filed by Adniqua Butler. $400.00 Filing Fee Paid - Receipt Number: 113J-2586728. (Attachments: #1 EEOC Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (csr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler v. Northpointe Hospitality Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adniqua Butler
Represented By: Ian Edward Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northpointe Hospitality Management, LLC
Represented By: Joyce M. Mocek
Represented By: Hillary L. Freesmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?