Passmore v. Travelers Casualty And Surety Company
Plaintiff: Cassandra Passmore
Defendant: Travelers Casualty And Surety Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00059
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephonic Status Conference originally scheduled for 7/30/2019 is RESCHEDULED for 8/2/2019 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. Dial-in instructions will be provided by Courtroom Deputy Clerk prior to scheduled call. (km)
June 24, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/30/2019 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. Dial-in instructions will be provided by Courtroom Deputy Clerk prior to scheduled call. (km)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/8/2019. Discovery due by 7/26/2019. Motions due by 10/25/2019. Pretrial Order due by 1/10/2020. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 7/8/2019. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 8/8/2019. Post-Discovery Status Report due by 9/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 6/24/2019. (csr)
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Karabinos, Karen)
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Douglas Adams on behalf of Cassandra Passmore (Adams, W.)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 Statement Enumerating All Motions Pending. There are no pending motions in the Superior Court of Glynn County, filed by Travelers Casualty And Surety Company. (Karabinos, Karen) Modified on 5/13/2019 (csr).
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 5/8/2019. (csr)
May 8, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Notice of Appearance due by 5/18/2019. Re-file any pending Motions due by 5/22/2019. (csr)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Travelers Casualty And Surety Company. (Karabinos, Karen)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 Removal Notice to All Counsel of Record re: #1 Notice of Removal. (csr)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Travelers Casualty And Surety Company.(Karabinos, Karen) Modified on 5/8/2019 (csr).
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Travelers Casualty And Surety Company from The Superior Court of Glynn County, Georgia, case number CE19-00420. (Filing fee paid on 5/8/2019 - $400 receipt number 113J-2597842). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, Complaint and Sheriff's Entry of Service, #2 Exhibit B - Answer, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Removal). (csr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/8/2019: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (csr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Passmore v. Travelers Casualty And Surety Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty And Surety Company
Represented By: Karen Kirkpatrick Karabinos
Represented By: Mary Alice Jasperse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandra Passmore
Represented By: W. Douglas Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?