Poppell et al v. Cardinal Health, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: K.M.M., M.G., Patricia Haythorn, Chrei Jones, Memorie Tindall, M.T., K.L.H., A.G., Madison Miller, B.M., Patricia Smith, K.G.H., S.G., A.T., Bryson Guest, R.T., J.G., K.L.M., M.W., Joseph Poppell, J.B., E.T. and S.T.
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, McKesson Drug Company, LLC, Richard D. Griffis, Jr., Cardinal Health 113, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Agape Prescriptions "R" Us, Inc., Christopher Grey May, Cardinal Health 116, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Charles Robert Lott, Woodbine Pharmacy, Inc., Cardinal Health 112, LLC, JM Smith Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Minnesota Supply, Inc., Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Alan M. Jones, Sabra L. Maddox, G&H Pharmacy, Inc., Rainbow Drug Store, Inc., Richard D. Griffis, III, Cardinal Health 108, LLC, McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc., Janice Ann Colter, Carey B. Jones, Cardinal Health 414, LLC and Cardinal Health Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00064
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by James B. Durham on behalf of Rainbow Drug Store, Inc., Richard D. Griffis, Jr, Richard D. Griffis, III (Durham, James)
June 28, 2019 Filing 60 Joint MOTION for Hearing re #55 MOTION to Reopen Case Joint MOTION to Vacate Remand Order Pursuant to FRCP 60(b)(3) by Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 112, LLC, Cardinal Health 113, LLC, Cardinal Health 116, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 414, LLC, Cardinal Health Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation, McKesson Drug Company, LLC, McKesson Medical-Surgical Minnesota Supply, Inc., McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.. Responses due by 7/12/2019. (Bauer, S.)
June 25, 2019 Filing 59 REPLY to Response to Motion re #55 MOTION to Reopen Case Joint MOTION to Vacate Remand Order Pursuant to FRCP 60(b)(3) filed by Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 112, LLC, Cardinal Health 113, LLC, Cardinal Health 116, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 414, LLC, Cardinal Health Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation, McKesson Drug Company, LLC, McKesson Medical-Surgical Minnesota Supply, Inc., McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.. (Bauer, S.)
June 21, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Intent to File Reply Brief by Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 112, LLC, Cardinal Health 113, LLC, Cardinal Health 116, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 414, LLC, Cardinal Health Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation, McKesson Drug Company, LLC, McKesson Medical-Surgical Minnesota Supply, Inc., McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.. (Wigington, Cody)
June 20, 2019 Filing 57 RESPONSE to Motion re #55 MOTION to Reopen Case Joint MOTION to Vacate Remand Order Pursuant to FRCP 60(b)(3) filed by A.G., A.T., B.M., E.T., Bryson Guest, Patricia Haythorn, J.B., J.G., Chrei Jones, K.G.H., K.L.H., K.L.M., K.M.M., M.G., M.T., M.W., Madison Miller, Joseph Poppell, R.T., S.G., S.T., Patricia Smith, Memorie Tindall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Table of Statutes and Duties, #2 Exhibit Table of Cases re Federal Question, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of James D. Durham, #4 Exhibit Affidavit of Paul Scott, #5 Exhibit Affidavit of Robert P. Killian)(Durham, James)
June 13, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE of Filing by Cardinal Health Inc., Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 112, LLC, Cardinal Health 113, LLC, Cardinal Health 116, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 414, LLC re #55 MOTION to Reopen Case Joint MOTION to Vacate Remand Order Pursuant to FRCP 60(b)(3) Amended Declaration of Christopher A. Wiech (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Christopher A. Wiech)(Wigington, Cody)
June 13, 2019 Filing 55 ******* MOTION to Reopen Case , Joint MOTION to Vacate Remand Order Pursuant to FRCP 60(b)(3) by Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 112, LLC, Cardinal Health 113, LLC, Cardinal Health 116, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 414, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation, McKesson Drug Company, LLC, McKesson Medical-Surgical Minnesota Supply, Inc., McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.. Responses due by 6/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Briefs, #2 Supplement)(Wigington, Cody)
June 5, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 06/04/2019, before Judge Lisa Godbey Wood. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debbie Gilbert, Telephone number (912) 262-2608. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. (Transcript Redaction Policy Issued or Click here to view <) Redaction Request due 6/26/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2019. (Gilbert, Debra)
June 4, 2019 Filing 53 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lisa G. Wood: Motion Hearing held on 6/4/2019 re #20 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by M.G., M.W., E.T., S.G., Memorie Tindall, J.G., Patricia Smith, K.L.H., K.L.M., Madison Miller, K.M.M., M.T., Joseph Poppell, A.T., J.B., K.G.H., Bryson Guest, A.G., R.T., B.M., Patricia Haythorn, S.T. (Court Reporter Debbie Gilbert.) (WS)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Remand to State Court; denying #20 Motion for Attorney Fees. The Clerk of Court is directed to REMAND this case to the Superior Court of Glynn County. All other outstanding motions in this action are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 6/4/2019. (ca)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER GRANTING #20 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by M.G., M.W., E.T., S.G., Memorie Tindall, J.G., Patricia Smith, K.L.H., K.L.M., Madison Miller, K.M.M., M.T., Joseph Poppell, A.T., J.B., K.G.H., Bryson Guest, A.G., R.T., B.M., Patricia Haythorn, S.T. Written order to follow. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 06/04/2019. (WS)
June 3, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE by Sabra L. Maddox of Entry of Appearance (Spurlin, John)
June 3, 2019 Filing 50 RESPONSE filed by Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 112, LLC, Cardinal Health 113, LLC, Cardinal Health 116, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 414, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Potential Tag-Along Action, #2 Exhibit Statement of Interest of US, #3 Exhibit Withdrawal of Order)(Wigington, Cody)
May 31, 2019 Filing 49 RESPONSE in Opposition re #39 MOTION to Stay [Plaintiffs' Response to Moving Defendants' Joint Motion to Stay] filed by A.G., A.T., B.M., E.T., Bryson Guest, Patricia Haythorn, J.B., J.G., Chrei Jones, K.G.H., K.L.H., K.L.M., K.M.M., M.G., M.T., M.W., Madison Miller, Joseph Poppell, R.T., S.G., S.T., Patricia Smith, Memorie Tindall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Anderson Cty - Remand Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Boston City - Remand Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Brooke Cty - Order Denying Stay, #4 Exhibit 4 - Dallas Cty - Remand Order, #5 Exhibit 5 - Delta Cty - Remand Order, #6 Exhibit 6 - Greenville Cty - Remand Order, #7 Exhibit 7 - Lexington Cty - Remand Order, #8 Exhibit 8 - Reno City - Remand Order, #9 Exhibit 9 - Spartanburg Cty - Remand Order, #10 Exhibit 10 - Uintah Cty - Order Denying Stay, #11 Exhibit 11 - Van Zandt Cty - Remand Order, #12 Exhibit 12 - Weber Cty - Order Denying Stay, #13 Exhibit 13 - Weber Cty - Remand Order, #14 Exhibit 14 - Kentucky v. Walgreens - Remand Order, #15 Exhibit 15 - Montana v. Purdue Pharma - Remand Order)(Durham, James)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 TEXT ORDER granting 46 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher A. Wiech. Cody S. Wigington has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Courts Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on May 31, 2019.
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 TEXT ORDER granting 45 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by S. Derek Bauer. Cody S. Wigington has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Courts Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on May 31, 2019.
May 31, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #45 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Petitioner S. Derek Bauer and #46 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Petitioner Christopher A. Wiech. (slt)
May 30, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Petitioner Christopher A. Wiech Receipt Number 113J-2613987, Fee Amount $200, by Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 112, LLC, Cardinal Health 113, LLC, Cardinal Health 116, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 414, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc.. Responses due by 6/13/2019. (Wigington, Cody)
May 30, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Petitioner S. Derek Bauer Receipt Number 113J-2613978, Fee Amount $200, by Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 112, LLC, Cardinal Health 113, LLC, Cardinal Health 116, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 414, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc.. Responses due by 6/13/2019. (Wigington, Cody)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 TEXT ORDER granting #41 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John C. Spurlin. Joseph H. Barrow has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Courts Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on May 30, 2019. (edd)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 TEXT ORDER granting #38 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John J. Haggerty. Dorothy H. Cornwell has entered an appearance in this case and vouches she will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on May 30, 2019. (edd)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 TEXT ORDER granting #37 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas S. Salter. Dorothy H. Cornwell has entered an appearance in this case and vouches she will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on May 30, 2019. (edd)
May 29, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #41 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (slt)
May 29, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number 113J-2612887, Fee Amount $200, by Sabra L. Maddox. Responses due by 6/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Barrow, Joseph)
May 29, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #39 MOTION to Stay. (slt)
May 29, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #38 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John J. Haggerty, #37 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Nicholas S. Salter. (slt)
May 28, 2019 Filing 40 BRIEF in Support of Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to MDL by Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 112, LLC, Cardinal Health 113, LLC, Cardinal Health 116, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 414, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation, McKesson Drug Company, LLC, McKesson Medical-Surgical Minnesota Supply, Inc., McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit !, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)(Tatum, John) Modified on 5/29/2019 (slt).
May 28, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION to Stay by Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 112, LLC, Cardinal Health 113, LLC, Cardinal Health 116, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 414, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation, McKesson Drug Company, LLC, McKesson Medical-Surgical Minnesota Supply, Inc., McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.. Responses due by 6/11/2019. (Tatum, John)
May 28, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John J. Haggerty Receipt Number 113J-2611996, Fee Amount $200, by G&H Pharmacy, Inc., JM Smith Corporation. Responses due by 6/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cornwell, Dorothy)
May 28, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Nicholas S. Salter Receipt Number 113J-2611987, Fee Amount $200, by G&H Pharmacy, Inc., JM Smith Corporation. Responses due by 6/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cornwell, Dorothy)
May 28, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #20 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Motion Hearing set for 6/4/2019 11:00 AM in Brunswick - Courtroom No. 1 - before Judge Lisa G. Wood. (ca)
May 28, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #20 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION for Attorney Fees . Responses due by 6/3/2019. (ca)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Immediate Hearing Under Local Rule 7.7. This Motion also requests an expedited briefing schedule on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand #20 . Defendants shall have until 6/3/19 to respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. A hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand is set for 6/4/19 at 11:00 a.m. at the Federal Courthouse in Brunswick, Georgia. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 5/28/2019. (ca)
May 28, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #20 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION for Attorney Fees : Motion Hearing set for 6/4/2019 11:00 AM in Brunswick - Courtroom No. 1 - before Judge Lisa G. Wood. (WS)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 TEXT ORDER granting #17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven Rosenwasser. James D. Durham has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on May 28, 2019. (edd)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 TEXT ORDER granting #16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Benjamin Fox. James D. Durham has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on May 28, 2019. (edd)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 TEXT ORDER granting #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John E. Floyd. James D. Durham has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on May 28, 2019. (edd)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TEXT ORDER granting #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Manoj S. Varghese. James D. Durham has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on May 28, 2019. (edd)
May 27, 2019 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 MOTION to Expedite MOTION for Hearing re #20 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION for Attorney Fees [Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Immediate Hearing Under Local Rule 7.7] filed by A.G., A.T., B.M., E.T., Bryson Guest, Patricia Haythorn, J.B., J.G., Chrei Jones, K.G.H., K.L.H., K.L.M., K.M.M., M.G., M.T., M.W., Madison Miller, Joseph Poppell, R.T., S.G., S.T., Patricia Smith, Memorie Tindall. (Durham, James)
May 26, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Intent to File Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Immediate Hearing Under Local Rule 7.7 by A.G., A.T., B.M., E.T., Bryson Guest, Patricia Haythorn, J.B., J.G., Chrei Jones, K.G.H., K.L.H., K.L.M., K.M.M., M.G., M.T., M.W., Madison Miller, Joseph Poppell, R.T., S.G., S.T., Patricia Smith, Memorie Tindall re #21 MOTION to Expedite MOTION for Hearing re #20 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION for Attorney Fees . (Durham, James)
May 24, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Expedite MOTION for Hearing re #20 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 112, LLC, Cardinal Health 113, LLC, Cardinal Health 116, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 414, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation, McKesson Drug Company, LLC, McKesson Medical-Surgical Minnesota Supply, Inc., McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.. (Tatum, John)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #9 Emergency Motion for Extension of Time; granting #11 , #12 , #18 , #24 Consent Motions for Extension of Time to Answer. All Defendants shall have until 6/18/19 to file any answer of to otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 5/24/2019. (ca)
May 24, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Hearing re #9 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to Emergency Motion to Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond , by Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 112, LLC, Cardinal Health 113, LLC, Cardinal Health 116, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 414, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation, McKesson Drug Company, LLC, McKesson Medical-Surgical Minnesota Supply, Inc., McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.. Responses due by 6/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tatum, John)
May 24, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew G. Moffett on behalf of G&H Pharmacy, Inc. (Moffett, Matthew)
May 24, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #24 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Motion or Other ResponseConsent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Previously Served. (slt)
May 24, 2019 Filing 24 *******Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, Motion or Other Response, and Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Previously Served by Woodbine Pharmacy, Inc.. Responses due by 6/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Evans, Robert) Modified on 5/24/2019 (slt).
May 24, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert K. Evans on behalf of Alan M. Jones, Carey B. Jones, Woodbine Pharmacy, Inc. (Evans, Robert)
May 24, 2019 Filing 22 BRIEF re #20 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION for Attorney Fees by A.G., A.T., B.M., E.T., Bryson Guest, Patricia Haythorn, J.B., J.G., Chrei Jones, K.G.H., K.L.H., K.L.M., K.M.M., M.G., M.T., M.W., Madison Miller, Joseph Poppell, R.T., S.G., S.T., Patricia Smith, Memorie Tindall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Robert P. Killian)(Durham, James)
May 24, 2019 Filing 21 ******* MOTION to Expedite , MOTION for Hearing re #20 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION for Attorney Fees by A.G., A.T., B.M., E.T., Bryson Guest, Patricia Haythorn, J.B., J.G., Chrei Jones, K.G.H., K.L.H., K.L.M., K.M.M., M.G., M.T., M.W., Madison Miller, Joseph Poppell, R.T., S.G., S.T., Patricia Smith, Memorie Tindall. Responses due by 6/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Durham, James)
May 24, 2019 Filing 20 ******* MOTION to Remand to State Court , and MOTION for Attorney Fees by A.G., A.T., B.M., E.T., Bryson Guest, Patricia Haythorn, J.B., J.G., K.G.H., K.L.H., K.L.M., K.M.M., M.G., M.T., M.W., Madison Miller, Joseph Poppell, R.T., S.G., S.T., Patricia Smith, Memorie Tindall. Responses due by 6/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Robert P. Killian)(Durham, James) Modified on 5/24/2019 (slt).
May 23, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to Emergency Motion to Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond , filed by Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 112, LLC, Cardinal Health 113, LLC, Cardinal Health 116, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 414, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation, McKesson Drug Company, LLC, McKesson Medical-Surgical Minnesota Supply, Inc., McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.. (Tatum, John)
May 23, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #18 MOTION for Extension of Time. (slt)
May 23, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Manoj S. Varghese, #16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Benjamin Fox, #17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Steven Rosenwasser, #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice JOHN E. FLOYD (slt)
May 23, 2019 Filing 18 CONSENT MOTION by Rainbow Drug Store, Inc. to extend time. (Ward, Jeffrey) Modified on 5/23/2019 (slt).
May 23, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Steven Rosenwasser Receipt Number 113J-2609576, Fee Amount $200, by A.G., A.T., B.M., E.T., Bryson Guest, Patricia Haythorn, J.B., J.G., Chrei Jones, K.G.H., K.L.H., K.L.M., K.M.M., M.G., M.T., M.W., Madison Miller, Joseph Poppell, R.T., S.G., S.T., Patricia Smith, Memorie Tindall. Responses due by 6/6/2019. (Durham, James)
May 23, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Benjamin Fox Receipt Number 113J-2609572, Fee Amount $200, by A.G., A.T., B.M., E.T., Bryson Guest, Patricia Haythorn, J.B., J.G., Chrei Jones, K.G.H., K.L.H., K.L.M., K.M.M., M.G., M.T., M.W., Madison Miller, Joseph Poppell, R.T., S.G., S.T., Patricia Smith, Memorie Tindall. Responses due by 6/6/2019. (Durham, James)
May 23, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice JOHN E. FLOYD Receipt Number 113J-2609569, Fee Amount $200, by A.G., A.T., B.M., E.T., Bryson Guest, Patricia Haythorn, J.B., J.G., Chrei Jones, K.G.H., K.L.H., K.L.M., K.M.M., M.G., M.T., M.W., Madison Miller, Joseph Poppell, R.T., S.G., S.T., Patricia Smith, Memorie Tindall. Responses due by 6/6/2019. (Durham, James)
May 23, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Manoj S. Varghese Receipt Number 113J-2609566, Fee Amount $200, by A.G., A.T., B.M., E.T., Bryson Guest, Patricia Haythorn, J.B., J.G., Chrei Jones, K.G.H., K.L.H., K.L.M., K.M.M., M.G., M.T., M.W., Madison Miller, Joseph Poppell, R.T., S.G., S.T., Patricia Smith, Memorie Tindall. Responses due by 6/6/2019. (Durham, James)
May 23, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , move, or otherwise respond, and #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , move, or otherwise respond. (slt)
May 22, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to Emergency Motion to Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond , filed by A.G., A.T., B.M., E.T., Bryson Guest, Patricia Haythorn, J.B., J.G., Chrei Jones, K.G.H., K.L.H., K.L.M., K.M.M., M.G., M.T., M.W., Madison Miller, Joseph Poppell, R.T., S.G., S.T., Patricia Smith, Memorie Tindall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulations Filed in State Court Prior to Removal, #2 Exhibit B - Emails between Varghese and Knapp dated 05-08-2019 through 05-16-2019, #3 Exhibit C - Emails between Varghese and Knapp dated 05-21-2019 and 05-22-2019)(Durham, James)
May 22, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , move, or otherwise respond by G&H Pharmacy, Inc.. Responses due by 6/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cornwell, Dorothy)
May 22, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , move, or otherwise respond by JM Smith Corporation. Responses due by 6/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cornwell, Dorothy)
May 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing by Rainbow Drug Store, Inc. Joint Stipulation (Ward, Jeffrey)
May 22, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #9 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. (slt)
May 22, 2019 Filing 9 Emergency MOTION to Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond , by Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 112, LLC, Cardinal Health 113, LLC, Cardinal Health 116, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 414, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation, McKesson Drug Company, LLC, McKesson Medical-Surgical Minnesota Supply, Inc., McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.. Responses due by 6/5/2019. (Tatum, John) Modified on 5/22/2019 (slt).
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald E. Harrison, II on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Harrison, Ronald)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Durham on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Durham, James)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Tatum on behalf of McKesson Corporation, McKesson Drug Company, LLC, McKesson Medical-Surgical Minnesota Supply, Inc., McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc. (Tatum, John)
May 21, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Agape Prescriptions "R" Us, Inc. answer due 5/28/2019; Cardinal Health 108, LLC answer due 5/28/2019; Cardinal Health 110, LLC answer due 5/28/2019; Cardinal Health 112, LLC answer due 5/28/2019; Cardinal Health 113, LLC answer due 5/28/2019; Cardinal Health 116, LLC answer due 5/28/2019; Cardinal Health 200, LLC answer due 5/28/2019; Cardinal Health 414, LLC answer due 5/28/2019; Cardinal Health, Inc. answer due 5/28/2019; Janice Ann Colter answer due 5/28/2019; G&H Pharmacy, Inc. answer due 5/28/2019; Richard D. Griffis, Jr answer due 5/28/2019; Richard D. Griffis, III answer due 5/28/2019; JM Smith Corporation answer due 5/28/2019; Alan M. Jones answer due 5/28/2019; Carey B. Jones answer due 5/28/2019; Charles Robert Lott answer due 5/28/2019; Sabra L. Maddox answer due 5/28/2019; Christopher Grey May answer due 5/28/2019; McKesson Corporation answer due 5/28/2019; McKesson Drug Company, LLC answer due 5/28/2019; McKesson Medical-Surgical Minnesota Supply, Inc. answer due 5/28/2019; McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc. answer due 5/28/2019; Rainbow Drug Store, Inc. answer due 5/28/2019; Woodbine Pharmacy, Inc. answer due 5/28/2019. (slt)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Dorothy H. Cornwell on behalf of JM Smith Corporation (Cornwell, Dorothy)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Dorothy H. Cornwell on behalf of G&H Pharmacy, Inc. (Cornwell, Dorothy)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 5/21/19. (slt)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD re: filing of #1 Notice of Removal. PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL INTENDING TO APPEAR IN THE REFERENCED MATTER MUST ENTER A NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OR A MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE NO LATER THAN TEN (10) DAYS AFTER THE ISSUANCE OF THIS NOTICE. PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL WHO DOES NOT INTEND TO REPRESENT PLAINTIFF IN THIS MATTER MUST NOTIFY THE CLIENT AND FILE A NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE (AND INCLUDE THE CLIENT'S ADDRESS) WITHIN THE SAME TEN (10) DAY PERIOD. Compliance due by 5/31/2019. (slt)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by McKesson Corporation, McKesson Drug Company, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Carey B. Jones, Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 112, LLC, Cardinal Health 113, LLC, Christopher Grey May, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cardinal Health 414, LLC, McKesson Medical-Surgical Minnesota Supply, Inc., Sabra L. Maddox, Cardinal Health 116, LLC, Janice Ann Colter, JM Smith Corporation, Woodbine Pharmacy, Inc., Agape Prescriptions "R" Us, Inc., McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc., G&H Pharmacy, Inc., Alan M. Jones from Superior Court of Glynn County, State of Georgia, case number CE19-00472. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113J-2606756). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons, Complaint, Verification for Injunctive Relief Request, General Civil Case Filing Information Form, Affidavit of Service, Entry of Service, Verified Application in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jennifer M. Robbins, Verified Application in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Stephen M. Premo, Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission for Mack H. Reed, Verified Application in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mack H. Reed, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Removal to Federal Court, Exhibit 1 Certificate of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poppell et al v. Cardinal Health, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Cody S. Wigington
Represented By: S. Derek Bauer
Represented By: John M. Tatum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Drug Company, LLC
Represented By: Cody S. Wigington
Represented By: S. Derek Bauer
Represented By: John M. Tatum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard D. Griffis, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Ward
Represented By: James B. Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 113, LLC
Represented By: Cody S. Wigington
Represented By: S. Derek Bauer
Represented By: Christopher A. Wiech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 200, LLC
Represented By: Cody S. Wigington
Represented By: S. Derek Bauer
Represented By: Christopher A. Wiech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agape Prescriptions "R" Us, Inc.
Represented By: Alan David Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Grey May
Represented By: Alan David Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 116, LLC
Represented By: Cody S. Wigington
Represented By: S. Derek Bauer
Represented By: Christopher A. Wiech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Cody S. Wigington
Represented By: S. Derek Bauer
Represented By: Christopher A. Wiech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Robert Lott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodbine Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel C. Hoffman
Represented By: Robert K. Evans
Represented By: William Justin Purvis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 112, LLC
Represented By: Cody S. Wigington
Represented By: S. Derek Bauer
Represented By: Christopher A. Wiech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JM Smith Corporation
Represented By: Nicholas S. Salter
Represented By: Dorothy H. Cornwell
Represented By: John J. Haggerty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Medical-Surgical Minnesota Supply, Inc.
Represented By: Cody S. Wigington
Represented By: S. Derek Bauer
Represented By: John M. Tatum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 110, LLC
Represented By: Cody S. Wigington
Represented By: S. Derek Bauer
Represented By: Christopher A. Wiech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan M. Jones
Represented By: Daniel C. Hoffman
Represented By: Robert K. Evans
Represented By: William Justin Purvis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sabra L. Maddox
Represented By: John C. Spurlin
Represented By: Joseph H. Barrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G&H Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas S. Salter
Represented By: Dorothy H. Cornwell
Represented By: John J. Haggerty
Represented By: Matthew G. Moffett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rainbow Drug Store, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Ward
Represented By: James B. Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard D. Griffis, III
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Ward
Represented By: James B. Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 108, LLC
Represented By: Cody S. Wigington
Represented By: S. Derek Bauer
Represented By: Christopher A. Wiech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.
Represented By: Cody S. Wigington
Represented By: S. Derek Bauer
Represented By: John M. Tatum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Ann Colter
Represented By: Alan David Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carey B. Jones
Represented By: Daniel C. Hoffman
Represented By: Robert K. Evans
Represented By: William Justin Purvis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 414, LLC
Represented By: Cody S. Wigington
Represented By: S. Derek Bauer
Represented By: Christopher A. Wiech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: S. Derek Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.M.M.
Represented By: Manoj S. Varghese
Represented By: John E. Floyd
Represented By: Steven J. Rosenwasser
Represented By: Ronald E. Harrison, II
Represented By: Benjamin E. Fox
Represented By: James D. Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.G.
Represented By: Manoj S. Varghese
Represented By: John E. Floyd
Represented By: Steven J. Rosenwasser
Represented By: Ronald E. Harrison, II
Represented By: Benjamin E. Fox
Represented By: James D. Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Haythorn
Represented By: Manoj S. Varghese
Represented By: John E. Floyd
Represented By: Steven J. Rosenwasser
Represented By: Ronald E. Harrison, II
Represented By: Benjamin E. Fox
Represented By: James D. Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chrei Jones
Represented By: Manoj S. Varghese
Represented By: John E. Floyd
Represented By: Steven J. Rosenwasser
Represented By: Ronald E. Harrison, II
Represented By: Benjamin E. Fox
Represented By: James D. Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Memorie Tindall
Represented By: Manoj S. Varghese
Represented By: John E. Floyd
Represented By: Steven J. Rosenwasser
Represented By: Ronald E. Harrison, II
Represented By: Benjamin E. Fox
Represented By: James D. Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.T.
Represented By: Manoj S. Varghese
Represented By: John E. Floyd
Represented By: Steven J. Rosenwasser
Represented By: Ronald E. Harrison, II
Represented By: Benjamin E. Fox
Represented By: James D. Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.L.H.
Represented By: Manoj S. Varghese
Represented By: John E. Floyd
Represented By: Steven J. Rosenwasser
Represented By: Ronald E. Harrison, II
Represented By: Benjamin E. Fox
Represented By: James D. Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.G.
Represented By: Manoj S. Varghese
Represented By: John E. Floyd
Represented By: Steven J. Rosenwasser
Represented By: Ronald E. Harrison, II
Represented By: Benjamin E. Fox
Represented By: James D. Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madison Miller
Represented By: Manoj S. Varghese
Represented By: John E. Floyd
Represented By: Steven J. Rosenwasser
Represented By: Ronald E. Harrison, II
Represented By: Benjamin E. Fox
Represented By: James D. Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.M.
Represented By: Manoj S. Varghese
Represented By: John E. Floyd
Represented By: Steven J. Rosenwasser
Represented By: Ronald E. Harrison, II
Represented By: Benjamin E. Fox
Represented By: James D. Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Smith
Represented By: Manoj S. Varghese
Represented By: John E. Floyd
Represented By: Steven J. Rosenwasser
Represented By: Ronald E. Harrison, II
Represented By: Benjamin E. Fox
Represented By: James D. Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.G.H.
Represented By: Manoj S. Varghese
Represented By: John E. Floyd
Represented By: Steven J. Rosenwasser
Represented By: Ronald E. Harrison, II
Represented By: Benjamin E. Fox
Represented By: James D. Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.G.
Represented By: Manoj S. Varghese
Represented By: John E. Floyd
Represented By: Steven J. Rosenwasser
Represented By: Ronald E. Harrison, II
Represented By: Benjamin E. Fox
Represented By: James D. Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.T.
Represented By: Manoj S. Varghese
Represented By: John E. Floyd
Represented By: Steven J. Rosenwasser
Represented By: Ronald E. Harrison, II
Represented By: Benjamin E. Fox
Represented By: James D. Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryson Guest
Represented By: Manoj S. Varghese
Represented By: John E. Floyd
Represented By: Steven J. Rosenwasser
Represented By: Ronald E. Harrison, II
Represented By: Benjamin E. Fox
Represented By: James D. Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.T.
Represented By: Manoj S. Varghese
Represented By: John E. Floyd
Represented By: Steven J. Rosenwasser
Represented By: Ronald E. Harrison, II
Represented By: Benjamin E. Fox
Represented By: James D. Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.G.
Represented By: Manoj S. Varghese
Represented By: John E. Floyd
Represented By: Steven J. Rosenwasser
Represented By: Ronald E. Harrison, II
Represented By: Benjamin E. Fox
Represented By: James D. Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.L.M.
Represented By: Manoj S. Varghese
Represented By: John E. Floyd
Represented By: Steven J. Rosenwasser
Represented By: Ronald E. Harrison, II
Represented By: Benjamin E. Fox
Represented By: James D. Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.W.
Represented By: Manoj S. Varghese
Represented By: John E. Floyd
Represented By: Steven J. Rosenwasser
Represented By: Ronald E. Harrison, II
Represented By: Benjamin E. Fox
Represented By: James D. Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Poppell
Represented By: Manoj S. Varghese
Represented By: John E. Floyd
Represented By: Steven J. Rosenwasser
Represented By: Ronald E. Harrison, II
Represented By: Benjamin E. Fox
Represented By: James D. Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.B.
Represented By: Manoj S. Varghese
Represented By: John E. Floyd
Represented By: Steven J. Rosenwasser
Represented By: Ronald E. Harrison, II
Represented By: Benjamin E. Fox
Represented By: James D. Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.T.
Represented By: Manoj S. Varghese
Represented By: John E. Floyd
Represented By: Steven J. Rosenwasser
Represented By: Ronald E. Harrison, II
Represented By: Benjamin E. Fox
Represented By: James D. Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.T.
Represented By: Manoj S. Varghese
Represented By: John E. Floyd
Represented By: Steven J. Rosenwasser
Represented By: Ronald E. Harrison, II
Represented By: Benjamin E. Fox
Represented By: James D. Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?