Smith et al v. HSBC Bank USA et al
Appellee: Christopher Anulewicz, HSBC Bank USA, National Association, Jill Jernigan, Patrick J. Burke, Bret Chaness, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., Ronnie Perry Realty Co., Inc., HSBC Bank USA, Paul A. Rogers, Peter Lublin, Geremy Gregory, Thomas R. Walker and Jarrod S. Mendel
Appellant: Sharon H. Smith and Marvin B. Smith, III
Trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee and R. Michael Souther
Case Number: 2:2019cv00073
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 13 Mail Returned as Undeliverable #12 Notice filed 8/1/19. Mail sent to Ronnie Perry Realty Co., Inc. (ca)
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE and CLERK'S Certification of Service to Counsel and Parties of Record re #7 Transmittal of Bankruptcy Record. Set/Reset Deadlines: Brief due by 8/31/2019. (ca)
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 Transmittal of Bankruptcy Record (PART 5) Appellant Brief due by 8/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 docs 740 - 758, #2 doc 761, #3 Adv. proc. 17-02016 docs 1 - 29, #4 docs 30 - 32, #5 doc 33, #6 doc 34 - 38, #7 doc 39) (USBC-Bergen, Janet)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 Transmittal of Bankruptcy Record (PART 4) Appellant Brief due by 8/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 doc 738) (USBC-Bergen, Janet)
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 Transmittal of Bankruptcy Record (PART 3) Appellant Brief due by 8/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 docs 732 - 736) (USBC-Bergen, Janet)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 Transmittal of Bankruptcy Record (PART 2) Appellant Brief due by 8/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 docs 699 thru 729) (USBC-Bergen, Janet)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 Transmittal of Bankruptcy Record (PART 1) Appellant Brief due by 8/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 case docket, #2 designation of contents, #3 Claim No. 10, #4 docs 154 - 648 (Transcript included), #5 doc 650 (STRICKEN), #6 docs 651 & 652 (STRICKEN), #7 doc 653 (STRICKEN)) (USBC-Bergen, Janet)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Christopher Anulewicz, Geremy Gregory re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, Incorrect Case Caption (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Emergency Motion))(Anulewicz, Christopher)
July 5, 2019 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable - copy of the docket sheet and NEF. Mail sent to Sharon H. Smith. (ca)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Jill Jernigan. (ca)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 Mail Returned as Undeliverable copy NEF and docket sheet. Mail sent to Ronnie Perry Realty Co., Inc. (ca)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 Mail Returned as Undeliverable copy of the docket sheet. Mail sent to Marvin B. Smith. (ca)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 07-20244. File received, filed by Sharon H. Smith and Marvin B. Smith, III. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Order, #3 Docket Sheet, #4 Notice to Appellant). (csr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. HSBC Bank USA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Christopher Anulewicz
Represented By: Christopher S. Anulewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HSBC Bank USA, National Association
Represented By: Jennifer R. Burbine
Represented By: Thomas R. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Jill Jernigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Patrick J. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bret Chaness
Represented By: Bret Jacob Chaness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Jennifer R. Burbine
Represented By: Thomas R. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Ronnie Perry Realty Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HSBC Bank USA
Represented By: Jennifer R. Burbine
Represented By: Thomas R. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Paul A. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Peter Lublin
Represented By: Bret Jacob Chaness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Geremy Gregory
Represented By: Geremy W. Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Thomas R. Walker
Represented By: Thomas R. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Jarrod S. Mendel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Sharon H. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Marvin B. Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee
Represented By: Matthew E. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: R. Michael Souther
Represented By: R. Michael Souther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?