Owners Insurance Company v. Brinkley et al
Plaintiff: Owners Insurance Company
Defendant: Ashton Brinkley, Dr. Scarlett M. Copeland, Violet Marchman, Wanda L. Waters, James Carol Waters, Michael Glenn Waters, Jared Spell, Appling County School District and Dr. Gene A. Starr
Case Number: 2:2019cv00107
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Chad M. Brock. Laura J. French has entered an appearance in this case and vouches she will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on September 13, 2019. (edd)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael C. Kendall. Laura J. French has entered an appearance in this case and vouches she will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on September 13, 2019. (edd)
September 12, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael C. Kendall. Receipt Number 113J-2682172, Fee Amount $200.00 #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Chad M. Brock. Receipt Number 113J-2682179, Fee Amount $200.00. (csr)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Chad M. Brock Receipt Number 113J-2682179, Fee Amount $200, by Owners Insurance Company. Responses due by 9/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(French, Laura)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael C. Kendall Receipt Number 113J-2682172, Fee Amount $200, by Owners Insurance Company. Responses due by 9/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(French, Laura)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (csr)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 9/9/2019. (csr)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Owners Insurance Company. $400.00 Filing Fee Paid - Receipt Number: 113J-2677414. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet). (csr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owners Insurance Company v. Brinkley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashton Brinkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Scarlett M. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Violet Marchman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wanda L. Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Carol Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Glenn Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Spell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Appling County School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Gene A. Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Chad M. Brock
Represented By: Laura Jones French
Represented By: Michael C. Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?