LaRoche et al v. Chapman et al
Plaintiff: Lawrence LaRoche, III and Parker Laroche
Defendant: James Stenander, Jason Turner, Michael Melton, George Trexler, David Gardner, FNU Johnson, Richard Perry, Karone Robinson, Brian Keebler, Robert Karwacki, One or more John Does, Christopher Chapman, Randy Turner and John Doe
Case Number: 2:2019cv00118
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Christopher Chapman, David Gardner, FNU Johnson, Robert Karwacki, Brian Keebler, Michael Melton, Richard Perry, Karone Robinson, James Stenander, George Trexler, Jason Turner, Randy Turner.(Strickland, Richard)
October 31, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Christopher Chapman answer due 11/14/2019; David Gardner answer due 11/14/2019; FNU Johnson answer due 11/14/2019; Robert Karwacki answer due 11/14/2019; Brian Keebler answer due 11/14/2019; Michael Melton answer due 11/14/2019; Richard Perry answer due 11/14/2019; Karone Robinson answer due 11/14/2019; James Stenander answer due 11/14/2019; George Trexler answer due 11/14/2019; Jason Turner answer due 11/14/2019; Randy Turner answer due 11/14/2019. (csr)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Clerk's Extension of Time (LR 6.1) to file Answer to #1 Complaint. Answer due November 14, 2019. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/31/2019. (csr)
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 Motion for Clerks Extension of Time (LR 6.1) to Answer Complaint by Christopher Chapman, David Gardner, FNU Johnson, Robert Karwacki, Brian Keebler, Michael Melton, Richard Perry, Karone Robinson, James Stenander, George Trexler, Jason Turner, Randy Turner. Responses due by 11/14/2019. (Strickland, Richard)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Containing #4 Summons, sent to E. Michael Ruberti. Unable To Forward. (MG)
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Christopher Chapman, David Gardner, FNU Johnson, Robert Karwacki, Brian Keebler, Michael Melton, Richard Perry, Karone Robinson, James Stenander, George Trexler, Jason Turner, and Randy Turner. (csr)
September 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Submitted (Ruberti, E.)
September 20, 2019 Filing fee paid: $400.00, receipt number 113J-2687939. (MG)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Rule 26 Instruction ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 09/20/2019. (MG)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against All Defendants, by Parker Laroche and Lawrence LaRoche, III. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons). (MG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LaRoche et al v. Chapman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Stenander
Represented By: Sean K. Scally
Represented By: Richard K. Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Turner
Represented By: Sean K. Scally
Represented By: Richard K. Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Melton
Represented By: Sean K. Scally
Represented By: Richard K. Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Trexler
Represented By: Sean K. Scally
Represented By: Richard K. Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Gardner
Represented By: Sean K. Scally
Represented By: Richard K. Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Johnson
Represented By: Sean K. Scally
Represented By: Richard K. Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Perry
Represented By: Sean K. Scally
Represented By: Richard K. Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karone Robinson
Represented By: Sean K. Scally
Represented By: Richard K. Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Keebler
Represented By: Sean K. Scally
Represented By: Richard K. Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Karwacki
Represented By: Sean K. Scally
Represented By: Richard K. Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One or more John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Chapman
Represented By: Sean K. Scally
Represented By: Richard K. Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Turner
Represented By: Sean K. Scally
Represented By: Richard K. Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence LaRoche, III
Represented By: E. Michael Ruberti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parker Laroche
Represented By: E. Michael Ruberti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?