Abram v. Saul
Plaintiff: Michael Tyrone Abram
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Not Yet Classified: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv00123
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Andrew Saul answer due 2/1/2020. (ca)
October 31, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Tyrone Abram. Andrew Saul served on 10/24/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Osterhout, Karl)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Otto Woelke Leithart on behalf of Andrew Saul (Leithart, Otto)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Karl E. Osterhout. Edward B. Claxton, III has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on October 16, 2019. (edd)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number 113J-2704754, Fee Amount $200, by Michael Tyrone Abram. Responses due by 10/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Supplemental List of Courts Admitted)(Claxton, Edward)
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (ca)
October 9, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 113J-2701628. (ca)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Michael Tyrone Abram. (ca)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Michael Tyrone Abram. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abram v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Tyrone Abram
Represented By: Edward B. Claxton, III
Represented By: Karl E Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?