Tuk v. Vika Logistics LLC et al
Plaintiff: Vincent E. Tuk
Defendant: Michael Lynn Carter, Arnaldo Gonzalez, Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, Vika Logistics LLC, US Xpress, Inc., US Xpress Leasing, Inc., Mountain Lake Risk Retention Group, Inc. and US Xpress Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00134
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #31 Motion to Substitute Attorney. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate Grant Smith and Jason Stewart as counsel of record for Defendant Starr Indemnity & Liability Company and add John Bonnie in their place. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 12/30/2019. (MG)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. (Bonnie, John)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Amended ANSWER to Complaint Amended Answer and Defenses of Starr Indemnity & Liability Company by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company.(Bonnie, John)
December 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION To Substitute Attorney by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney (Bonnie, John). Modified on 12/26/2019 (MG).
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TEXT ORDER granting [28, 29] Motions for Leave of Absence by Michael D. Hostetter for the dates of: January 20, 2020 through and including January 22, 2020; February 18, 2020 through and including February 24, 2020; April 17, 2020 through and including April 27, 2020; May 21, 2020 through and including May 25, 2020; June 29, 2020 through and including July 5, 2020; August 10, 2020 through and including September 1, 2020; October 19, 2020 through and including October 26, 2020; and November 24, 2020 through and including November 30, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on December 19, 2019. (edd)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to US Xpress, Inc. for dates of : January 20, 2020 through and including January 22, 2020, February 18, 2020 through and including February 24, 2020, April 17, 2020 through and including April 27, 2020, May 21, 2020 through and including May 25, 2020, June 29, 2020 through and including July 5, 2020, August 10, 2020 through and including September 1, 2020, October 19, 2020 through and including October 26, 2020, and November 24, 2020 through and including November 30, 2020. by US Xpress, Inc.. Responses due by 1/2/2020. (Hostetter, Michael)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to US Xpress, Inc. for dates of : January 20, 2020 through and including January 22, 2020, February 18, 2020 through and including February 24, 2020, April 17, 2020 through and including April 27, 2020, May 21, 2020 through and including May 25, 2020, June 29, 2020 through and including July 5, 2020, August 10, 2020 through and including September 1, 2020, October 19, 2020 through and including October 26, 2020, and November 24, 2020 through and including November 30, 2020. by US Xpress, Inc.. Responses due by 1/2/2020. (Hostetter, Michael)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ***ENTERED IN ERROR*** Modified on 12/19/2019 (MG).
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arnaldo Gonzalez, Vika Logistics LLC. (Stewart, Jason)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint by Arnaldo Gonzalez, Vika Logistics LLC.(Stewart, Jason)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company.(Stewart, Jason)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Michael Lynn Carter, US Xpress, Inc. identifying U. S. Xpress Enterprises, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (Hostetter, Michael)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint by Michael Lynn Carter, US Xpress, Inc..(Hostetter, Michael)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting the #20 Consent Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted against Defendants U.S. Xpress Leasing, Inc., U.S. Xpress Enterprises, Inc., and Mountain Lake Risk Retention Group are DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate these parties from the docket. Each party shall bear its own fees and costs. All other claims remain pending. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 12/5/2019. (ca)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Consent MOTION to Dismiss Less Than All Defendants, by Mountain Lake Risk Retention Group, Inc., US Xpress Enterprises, Inc., US Xpress Leasing, Inc., US Xpress, Inc. Responses due by 12/17/2019. (Hostetter, Michael)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Vika Logistics LLC c/o manager Vincente Furiati - addtl service on 12-02-19, filed by Vincent E. Tuk. (Durham, James)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Yenesi Regla Gonzalez Garcia co-resident and niece to Arnaldo Gonzalez pursuant to F.S. 48.031(1)(a) Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 on 11-28-2019, filed by Vincent E. Tuk. (Durham, James)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Arnaldo Gonzalez answer due 12/19/2019. (MG)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Arnaldo Gonzalez. (evk)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Arnaldo Gonzalez. (csr)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Summons Submitted (Durham, James)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Summons Submitted (Durham, James)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons, Affidavits of NonService, Ltr to Secretary of State served on Vika Logistics LLC c/o Secretary of State on 11-27-2019, filed by Vincent E. Tuk. (Durham, James)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Vika Logistics LLC answer due 12/18/2019. (csr)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Michael Lynn Carter on 11-18-2019, filed by Vincent E. Tuk. (Durham, James)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Martin Sullivan for Mountain Lake Risk on 11-18-2019, filed by Vincent E. Tuk. (Durham, James)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Alisha Smith for US Xpress Enterprises, Inc. on 11-15-2019, filed by Vincent E. Tuk. (Durham, James)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Alisha Smith for US Xpress Leasing, Inc. on 11-15-2019, filed by Vincent E. Tuk. (Durham, James)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Alisha Smith for US Xpress, Inc. on 11-15-2019, filed by Vincent E. Tuk. (Durham, James)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Jane Richardson for Starr Indemnity & Liability on 11-15-2019, filed by Vincent E. Tuk. (Durham, James)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Michael Lynn Carter answer due 12/9/2019; Mountain Lake Risk Retention Group, Inc. answer due 12/9/2019; Starr Indemnity & Liability Company answer due 12/6/2019; US Xpress Enterprises, Inc. answer due 12/6/2019; US Xpress Leasing, Inc. answer due 12/6/2019; US Xpress, Inc. answer due 12/6/2019. (MG)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Arnaldo Gonzalez. (MG)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Submitted (O'Reilly, Shannon)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (MG)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 11/08/2019. (MG)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ***Corrected Entry at Docket #4 . (MG) Modified on 11/12/2019 (MG).
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Vincent E. Tuk. (Fee paid: $400- Receipt # 113J-2721582) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (MG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tuk v. Vika Logistics LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Lynn Carter
Represented By: Michael D. Hostetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnaldo Gonzalez
Represented By: Grant B. Smith
Represented By: Jason Shawn Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starr Indemnity & Liability Company
Represented By: Grant B. Smith
Represented By: John C. Bonnie
Represented By: Jason Shawn Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vika Logistics LLC
Represented By: Grant B. Smith
Represented By: Jason Shawn Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Xpress, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D. Hostetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Xpress Leasing, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D. Hostetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain Lake Risk Retention Group, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D. Hostetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Xpress Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D. Hostetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent E. Tuk
Represented By: Shannon Colleen O'Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?