Donjon-Smit, LLC v. Schultz et al
Plaintiff: Donjon-Smit, LLC
Defendant: Admiral Karl L. Schultz, Commander Norm C. Witt, Commander Matthew J. Baer and Captain John W. Reed
Case Number: 2:2020cv00011
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2020 Filing 98 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro: Telephonic Status Conference held on 4/10/2020. (Tape #BWC-CHAMBERS.) (km)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER re #95 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. The Court ORDERS Defendants to file their motion to stay on or before April 17, 2020. If Defendants do not file a motion to stay by April 17, 2020, the Court will issue a scheduling order in the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 4/10/2020. (ca)
April 10, 2020 Set Deadlines: Compliance re Order #97 due by 4/17/2020. (ca)
April 9, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #95 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (ca)
April 9, 2020 Filing 96 NOTICE by Matthew J. Baer, John W. Reed, Karl L. Schultz, Norm C. Witt of Current Status of Response (Attachments: #1 Weekly Executive Summary (Mar 31, 2020 - April 6, 2020))(Mann, Martha)
April 9, 2020 Filing 95 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Schmidt, Peter)
April 8, 2020 Filing 94 MOTION to Dismiss Individual-Capacity Claims by Karl Schultz, John Reed, Norm Witt, Matthew Baer. Responses due by 4/22/2020. (Patrick, Bradford)
April 6, 2020 Filing 93 MOTION to Dismiss by Matthew J. Baer, John W. Reed, Karl L. Schultz, Norm C. Witt. Responses due by 4/20/2020. (Mann, Martha)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER denying #57 First MOTION to Compel Whole Administrative Record. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 04/03/2020. (MG)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER that the parties confer under Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(f) and submit their Rule 26(f) report on or before Thursday, April 9, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 4/2/2020. (ca)
April 2, 2020 Filing 90 RESPONSE in Opposition re #57 First MOTION to Compel Whole Administrative Record filed by Matthew J. Baer, John W. Reed, Karl L. Schultz, Norm C. Witt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian Judge)(Mann, Martha)
April 2, 2020 Filing 89 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 04/01/2020, before Judge Lisa Godbey Wood. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debbie Gilbert, Telephone number (912) 262-2608. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. (Transcript Redaction Policy Issued or Click here to view #Transcript Redaction Policy) Redaction Request due 4/23/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/3/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/1/2020. (Gilbert, Debra)
April 2, 2020 Filing 88 Brief in Support re #57 First MOTION to Compel Whole Administrative Record Supplemental Filing filed by Donjon-Smit, LLC. (Schmidt, Peter)
April 2, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/10/2020 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. Dial-in instructions will be provided by Courtroom Deputy Clerk prior to scheduled call. (km)
April 1, 2020 Filing 87 NOTICE by Matthew J. Baer, John W. Reed, Karl L. Schultz, Norm C. Witt of Current Status of Response (Attachments: #1 St. Simons Sound Incident - Weekly Executive Summary)(Mann, Martha)
March 30, 2020 Filing 86 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/1/2020 03:00 PM in L G Wood Chambers before Judge Lisa G. Wood. (Attachments: #1 Dial-in Instructions)(WS)
March 30, 2020 Filing 85 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lisa G. Wood: Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/24/2020. (Court Reporter Debbie Gilbert.) (WS)
March 26, 2020 Filing 84 NOTICE by Matthew J. Baer, John W. Reed, Karl L. Schultz, Norm C. Witt of status of response (Mar17-23, 2020) (Attachments: #1 Weekly Executive Summary (Mar17-23, 2020))(Mann, Martha)
March 24, 2020 Filing 83 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 03/24/2020, before Judge Lisa Godbey Wood. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debbie Gilbert, Telephone number (912) 262-2608. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. (Transcript Redaction Policy Issued or Click here to view #Transcript Redaction Policy) Redaction Request due 4/14/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/24/2020. (Gilbert, Debra) Modified on 3/24/2020 (slt).
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER denying #6 Motion for Injunctive Relief. Plaintiff's request for a preliminary injunction is DENIED. The Court reserves its power to issue a decision regarding Plaintiff's permanent injunction for a more appropriate time. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 03/24/2020. (WS)
March 23, 2020 Filing 81 RESPONSE to #70 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Donjon-Smit, LLC filed by Matthew J. Baer, John W. Reed, Karl L. Schultz, Norm C. Witt. (Mann, Martha)
March 18, 2020 Filing 80 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 3/24/2020 03:00 PM in L G Wood Chambers before Judge Lisa G. Wood. (Attachments: #1 Dial in instructions)(WS)
March 18, 2020 Filing 79 NOTICE by Matthew J. Baer, John W. Reed, Karl L. Schultz, Norm C. Witt of Current Status of Response (Attachments: #1 Weekly Executive Summary (Mar 10-16, 2020))(Mann, Martha)
March 17, 2020 Filing 78 NOTICE of Manual Filing Exhibit 5 DVD by Donjon-Smit, LLC to #70 Reply to Response to Motion #57 . (ca)
March 17, 2020 Filing 77 NOTICE of Manual Filing The Original Video and Synchronized Copy Of The Deposition of Commander Norm C. Witt Taken on March 9, 2020 by Donjon-Smit, LLC. (ca)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting #74 Motion to Seal Exhibit A until further Order of the Court. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 3/16/2020. (ca)
March 16, 2020 Filing 74 MOTION to Seal Document by Matthew J. Baer, John W. Reed, Karl L. Schultz, Norm C. Witt. Responses due by 3/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 proposed order)(Mann, Martha)
March 16, 2020 Filing 73 NOTICE by Matthew J. Baer, John W. Reed, Karl L. Schultz, Norm C. Witt of FIling (Attachments: #1 Weekly Executive Summaries)(Mann, Martha)
March 16, 2020 Filing 72 NOTICE of Manual Filing by Donjon-Smit, LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Intent to Manually File Exhibit 5 to Docket 70 (Schmidt, Peter)
March 16, 2020 Filing 71 NOTICE of Manual Filing by Donjon-Smit, LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Intent to Manually File The Original Video and Syncronized Copy of the Deposition of Commander Norm C. Witt Taken on March 9, 2020 (Schmidt, Peter)
March 16, 2020 Filing 70 REPLY to Response to Motion re #57 First MOTION to Compel Whole Administrative Record filed by Donjon-Smit, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2019.12.8 DJS email to USGC re Plan, #2 Exhibit 2019.12.9 DJS email to Reed re Plan, #3 Exhibit 2019.12.8 DJS Plan, #4 Exhibit 2019.12.8 DJS Plan Register)(Schmidt, Peter)
March 13, 2020 Filing 69 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #57 First MOTION to Compel Whole Administrative Record filed by Matthew J. Baer, John W. Reed, Karl L. Schultz, Norm C. Witt. (Attachments: #1 Email Communications, #2 DHS Administrative Record Guidance, #3 SUPSALV Documents, #4 Declaration of Brian Judge, #5 DOJ ENRD Administrative Record Guidance)(Mann, Martha)
March 12, 2020 Filing 68 Summons Issued as to Matthew J. Baer, John W. Reed, Karl L. Schultz, Norm C. Witt re #56 AMENDED COMPLAINT. (ca)
March 12, 2020 Filing 67 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Donjon-Smit, LLC identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (Odachowski, Joseph)
March 12, 2020 Filing 66 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Donjon-Smit, LLC. (Odachowski, Joseph)
March 12, 2020 Filing 65 Summons Submitted (Odachowski, Joseph) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/12/2020: #1 Corrected PDF) (ca).
March 12, 2020 Filing 64 Summons Submitted (Odachowski, Joseph) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/12/2020: #1 Corrected PDF) (ca).
March 12, 2020 Filing 63 Summons Submitted (Odachowski, Joseph) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/12/2020: #1 Corrected PDF) (ca).
March 12, 2020 Filing 62 Summons Submitted (Odachowski, Joseph) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/12/2020: #1 Corrected PDF) (ca).
March 11, 2020 Filing 61 Proposed Findings of Fact by Matthew J. Baer, John W. Reed, Karl L. Schultz, Norm C. Witt. (Attachments: #1 Incident Action Plan - Period 14, #2 Owner Response to Administrative Order 01-19, Amendment 1, #3 Administrative Order 01-19, Amendment 2, #4 Owner Response to Administrative Order 01-19, Amendment 2, Conditions 3 and 4)(Mann, Martha)
March 11, 2020 Filing 60 Proposed Findings of Fact by Donjon-Smit, LLC. (Odachowski, Joseph)
March 11, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE by Matthew J. Baer, John W. Reed, Karl L. Schultz, Norm C. Witt of Current Status of Incident Response (Attachments: #1 St. Simons Sound Incident - Weekly Executive Summary)(Mann, Martha)
March 11, 2020 Filing 58 DEPOSITION of Cmdr. Norman C. Witt taken on March 9, 2020 by Donjon-Smit, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Commander Witt CV, #2 Exhibit Excerpt from Appendix C to COMDTINST M3010.24, #3 Exhibit 2019.9.15 Witt letter to Hyundai re Administrative Order: 01-19, #4 Exhibit 2019.10.16 P&I Club to DJS re Letter of Intent, #5 Exhibit 2019.9.20 Salvage, Firefighting and Lightering Contract and Funding Agreement, #6 Exhibit 2019.11.5 DJS Wreck Removal Method Statement, #7 Exhibit 2019.11.22 Witt letter to Hyundai re Administrative Order: 01-19 Amendment 2, #8 Exhibit 2019.11.20 P&I Club Email with Cmdr. Witt, #9 Exhibit 2019.11.26 DJS letter and submittal re 11.5.2019 Proposal, #10 Exhibit 2019.12.3 and 19 FOSC emails with SERT re T&T and DJS, #11 Exhibit List of documents review by Commander Witt in preparation for deposition, #12 Exhibit 2019.11.8 Transitional Agreement, #13 Exhibit 2019.11.25 Hyundai memo to Cmdr. Witt re Administrative Order: 01-19 Amendment 2, #14 Exhibit 2019.12.1 Witt letter to Hyundai re Reply To Response of The Administrative Order 01-19 Amendment 2, #15 Exhibit 2019.11.17 GSC (Hyundai) Invitation to tender, #16 Exhibit 2019.12.19 Hyundai memo to Cmdr. Witt re Request for Approval of Deviation, #17 Exhibit 2019.12.19 Cmdr. Witt ltr to Hyundai Approval of Deviation, #18 Exhibit 2019.12.21 Cmdr Witt decision memo re deviation, #19 Exhibit 2019.12.19 Emails between Jim Elliott Norm Witt and John Reed re Golden Ray and OPA 90, #20 Exhibit 2019.12.23 DJS ltr to Hyundai re notice of breach, #21 Exhibit 2019.12.22 DJS (Hankins) email to Cmdr.Witt and Capt.Reed, #22 Exhibit xpoSure Risk Forecasts)(Schmidt, Peter)
March 11, 2020 Filing 57 First MOTION to Compel Whole Administrative Record by Donjon-Smit, LLC. Responses due by 3/25/2020. (Schmidt, Peter)
March 10, 2020 Filing 56 AMENDED COMPLAINT AGAINST DEFENDANTS, filed by Donjon-Smit, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Timothy Williamson, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2019.11.8 Admin Order - Amend 1, #3 Exhibit 3 - 2019.11.5 DJS Wreck Removal Method, #4 Exhibit 4 - 2019.12.22-23 Email Chain, #5 Exhibit 5 - 2020.2.6 UC Statement)(Schmidt, Peter) Modified on 3/11/2020 (ca).
March 10, 2020 Filing 55 DEPOSITION of Cmdr. Norman C. Witt taken on March 9, 2020 by Donjon-Smit, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Transcript Deposition of Cmdr. Norman C, Witt)(Schmidt, Peter)
March 9, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONIC Conference Call set for 3/13/2020 02:30 PM in L G Wood Chambers before Judge Lisa G. Wood. (Attachments: #1 Instructions)(WS)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER denying #47 Motion for order requiring Defendants to produce certain records and Orders the deposition to go forward as scheduled. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 3/6/20. (wwp)
March 6, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE by Matthew J. Baer, John W. Reed, Karl L. Schultz, Norm C. Witt of Filing Revised Certified Index and Addendum to the Administrative Record (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Revised Index, #3 Addendum)(Mann, Martha)
March 6, 2020 Filing 51 REPLY to Response to Motion re #47 MOTION for Order Requiring Defendants and Commander Witt to Produce Certain Records for Use At His Deposition Scheduled for 03/09/2020 Second Reply, RESPONSE to Motion for Order Requiring Def Witt to Produce, RESPONSE filed by Donjon-Smit, LLC. (Odachowski, Joseph)
March 5, 2020 Filing 50 REPLY to Response to Motion re #47 MOTION for Order Requiring Defendants and Commander Witt to Produce Certain Records for Use At His Deposition Scheduled for 03/09/2020 (in Reply to Defendant's Opposition - DKT 49) filed by Donjon-Smit, LLC. (Odachowski, Joseph)
March 4, 2020 Filing 49 RESPONSE in Opposition re #47 MOTION for Order Requiring Defendants and Commander Witt to Produce Certain Records for Use At His Deposition Scheduled for 03/09/2020 filed by Matthew J. Baer, John W. Reed, Karl L. Schultz, Norm C. Witt. (Mann, Martha)
March 4, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE of Intent to Oppose by Matthew J. Baer, John W. Reed, Karl L. Schultz, Norm C. Witt re #47 MOTION for Order Requiring Defendants and Commander Witt to Produce Certain Records for Use At His Deposition Scheduled for 03/09/2020. (Patrick, Bradford)
March 4, 2020 Filing 47 MOTION for Order Requiring Defendants and Commander Witt to Produce Certain Records for Use At His Deposition Scheduled for 03/09/2020 by Donjon-Smit, LLC. Responses due by 3/18/2020. (Odachowski, Joseph)
March 3, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of Filing by Matthew J. Baer, John W. Reed, Karl L. Schultz, Norm C. Witt Notice of Filing Certifed Index to the Administrative Record (Attachments: #1 Certification of Administrative Record, #2 Administrative Record Index)(Mann, Martha)
March 3, 2020 Filing 45 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lisa G. Wood: Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/2/2020. (Court Reporter Debbie Gilbert.) (en)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #42 Motion seeking brief continuance prior to the issuance of a decision by the Court on Plaintiff's request for an injunction. Plaintiff and Defendants shall have until March 11, 2020 to file any additional proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law. Plaintiff is permitted to depose FOSC Commander on or before March 9, 2020. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 3/2/2020. (ca)
March 2, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE by Matthew J. Baer, John W. Reed, Karl L. Schultz, Norm C. Witt of Current Status of Incident Response (Mann, Martha)
March 2, 2020 Filing 42 *******Second MOTION Order re Administrative Record; to keep Evidence Open; Complete Copy of Admin Record & Reasonable Opportunity to Respond & Supp Proposed Findings of Facts re #31 MOTION Order re Administrative Record; to Keep Evidence Open & Expedited Discovery by Donjon-Smit, LLC. Responses due by 3/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Odachowski, Joseph)
March 2, 2020 Filing 41 TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED for 3/2/2020 04:00 PM in L G Wood Chambers before Judge Lisa G. Wood. (en) (en).
March 2, 2020 Filing 40 RESPONSE to #36 Proposed Findings of Fact filed by John W. Reed, Karl L. Schultz, Norm C. Witt, Matthew J. Baer filed by Donjon-Smit, LLC. (Odachowski, Joseph)
March 2, 2020 Set Deadlines: Compliance re #44 Order due by 3/11/2020. (ca)
February 28, 2020 Filing 39 Proposed Findings of Fact by Donjon-Smit, LLC. (Odachowski, Joseph)
February 28, 2020 Filing 38 Proposed Findings of Fact by Donjon-Smit, LLC. (Schmidt, Peter)
February 28, 2020 Filing 37 Proposed Findings of Fact by Donjon-Smit, LLC. (Odachowski, Joseph)
February 28, 2020 Filing 36 Proposed Findings of Fact by Matthew J. Baer, John W. Reed, Karl L. Schultz, Norm C. Witt. (Mann, Martha)
February 27, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Hearing per order #33 - Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/4/2020 10:00 AM in L G Wood Chambers before Judge Lisa G. Wood. (Attachments: #1 Conference Instructions)(WS)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #31 Motion Order re Administrative Record; to Keep Evidence Open & Expedited Discovery. The Court will hold a status conference via telephone on March 4, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. to discuss a comprehensive scheduling order. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 2/27/2020. (ca)
February 27, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 02/25/2020, before Judge Lisa Godbey Wood. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debbie Gilbert, Telephone number (912) 262-2608. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. (Transcript Redaction Policy Issued or Click here to view <) Redaction Request due 3/19/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/29/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/27/2020. (Gilbert, Debra)
February 27, 2020 Set Deadline: Compliance re #33 Order due by 3/3/2020. (ca)
February 26, 2020 Filing 31 ******* MOTION Order re Administrative Record; to Keep Evidence Open & Expedited Discovery by Donjon-Smit, LLC. Responses due by 3/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Odachowski, Joseph)
February 25, 2020 Filing 35 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lisa G. Wood: Motion Hearing held on 2/25/2020 re #6 MOTION Injunctive Relief re #1 Complaint, filed by Donjon-Smit, LLC. (Court Reporter Debbie Gilbert.) (WS)
February 25, 2020 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Defendants on 02/15/2020, filed by Donjon-Smit, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Odachowski, Joseph) Modified on 2/25/2020 (ca).
February 25, 2020 Filing 29 Brief in Support re #6 MOTION Injunctive Relief re #1 Complaint, Supplement to Attach Omitted Exhibit filed by Donjon-Smit, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Fuel Offload)(Odachowski, Joseph) Modified on 2/25/2020 (ca).
February 25, 2020 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION Injunctive Relief re #1 Complaint, filed by Donjon-Smit, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2020.2.21 NYTimes, #2 Exhibit 2 - Bwick News, #3 Exhibit 3 - 2020.2.19 Bwick New re BN - Rotary Club briefing, #4 Exhibit 4 - 2020.1.8 Salvage Group hired, #5 Exhibit 5 - Public Forum Displays, #6 Exhibit 6 - Handbook)(Schmidt, Peter) Modified on 2/25/2020 (ca).
February 25, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter H. Schmidt, II on behalf of Donjon-Smit, LLC (Schmidt, Peter)
February 24, 2020 Filing 26 Brief in Support re #6 MOTION Injunctive Relief re #1 Complaint, in Response to Court's Initial Questions filed by Donjon-Smit, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Williamson, #2 Exhibit 1)(Odachowski, Joseph) Modified on 2/25/2020 (ca).
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ORDER granting #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Clifford Bowie Husted. Joseph R. Odachowski has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on February 24, 2020. (edd)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ORDER granting #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by W. Garney Griggs. Joseph R. Odachowski has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on February 24, 2020. (edd)
February 24, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Intent to Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Donjon-Smit, LLC. (Odachowski, Joseph) Modified on 2/24/2020 (ca).
February 23, 2020 Filing 22 BRIEF re #19 Order, Response to Court's Order of February 21, 2020 by Matthew J. Baer, John W. Reed, Karl L. Schultz, Norm C. Witt. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5, #6 Attachment 6, #7 Attachment 7, #8 Attachment 8, #9 Attachment 9)(Mann, Martha)
February 21, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION Injunctive Relief re #1 Complaint, filed by Donjon-Smit, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)(Odachowski, Joseph) Modified on 2/24/2020 (ca).
February 21, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION Injunctive Relief re #1 Complaint, filed by Matthew J. Baer, John W. Reed, Karl L. Schultz, Norm C. Witt. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 (Anglin Declaration), #2 Attachment 2 (Alonso Declaration), #3 Attachment 3)(Mann, Martha)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER regarding the hearing scheduled for February 25, 2020. The attorneys are hereby informed of the initial questions the Court is considering, and Counsel should submit their answers to these questions and provide specific reference to the witness(es) or document(s) expected to substantiate such answers during the hearing. Any such submissions should be filed by 5:00 p.m. on February 24, 2020. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 2/21/2020. (ca)
February 21, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance re #19 Order due by 5:00 p.m. on 2/24/2020. (ca)
February 20, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing by Donjon-Smit, LLC re #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Clifford Bowie Husted Receipt Number 113J-2787486, Fee Amount $200,, #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of W. Garney Griggs Receipt Number 113J-2787481, Fee Amount $200, List of all cases (Odachowski, Joseph)
February 20, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R. Odachowski on behalf of Donjon-Smit, LLC (Odachowski, Joseph)
February 20, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R. Odachowski on behalf of Donjon-Smit, LLC (Odachowski, Joseph)
February 20, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Clifford Bowie Husted Receipt Number 113J-2787486, Fee Amount $200, by Donjon-Smit, LLC. Responses due by 3/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Cert of Good Standing)(Odachowski, Joseph)
February 20, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of W. Garney Griggs Receipt Number 113J-2787481, Fee Amount $200, by Donjon-Smit, LLC. Responses due by 3/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Cert of Good Standing)(Odachowski, Joseph)
February 20, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Clifford Bowie Husted, #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of W. Garney Griggs. (ca)
February 19, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Sydney Menees on behalf of All Defendants (Menees, Sydney)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Continue. The hearing will proceed on Tuesday, February 25, 2020 at 10:00 am., and, given the importance and time-sensitive nature of the matter, no further extensions will be granted. Any pre-hearing briefs must be submitted by 5:00 p.m. on Friday, February 21, 2020. Given the importance and time-sensitive nature of the allegations, Counsel are hereby informed that the Court will meet with them (in Court or by telephone) at least once a week, every week, until the case concludes. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 2/18/2020. (ca)
February 18, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Continue /Reschedule Hearing by Donjon-Smit, LLC. Responses due by 3/3/2020. (Odachowski, Joseph)
February 18, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradford Collins Patrick on behalf of All Defendants (Patrick, Bradford)
February 18, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #6 MOTION Injunctive Relief re #1 Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 2/19/2020 10:00 AM in Brunswick - Courtroom No. 1 - before Judge Lisa G. Wood. (WS)
February 18, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Pre-Hearing Briefs due by 5:00 p.m. on 2/21/2020. (ca)
February 18, 2020 Reset Hearing: Motions Hearing on #6 MOTION Injunctive Relief re #1 Complaint is rescheduled for 2/25/2020 10:00 AM in Brunswick - Courtroom No. 1 - before Judge Lisa G. Wood. (ca)
February 17, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION Injunctive Relief re #1 Complaint, (Response In Opposition to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order) filed by Matthew J. Baer, John W. Reed, Karl L. Schultz, Norm C. Witt. (Mann, Martha)
February 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Martha Mann on behalf of All Defendants (Mann, Martha)
February 14, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Donjon-Smit, LLC. (csr)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 2/14/2020. (csr)
February 13, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Injunctive Relief and Brief in Support of re: #1 Complaint, filed by Donjon-Smit, LLC. (csr)
February 13, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Donjon-Smit, LLC. (csr)
February 13, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Donjon-Smit, LLC. (csr)
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Donjon-Smit, LLC. $400.00 Filing Fee Paid - Receipt Number: 113J-2783527. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Declaration of Timothy P. Williamson, #6 Civil Cover Sheet). (csr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donjon-Smit, LLC v. Schultz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donjon-Smit, LLC
Represented By: Joseph R. Odachowski
Represented By: W. Garney Griggs
Represented By: Peter H. Schmidt, II
Represented By: Clifford Bowie Husted
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Admiral Karl L. Schultz
Represented By: Sydney Menees
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: Martha Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commander Norm C. Witt
Represented By: Sydney Menees
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: Martha Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commander Matthew J. Baer
Represented By: Sydney Menees
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: Martha Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain John W. Reed
Represented By: Sydney Menees
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: Martha Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?