Atkins v. Georgia Housing and Finance Authority
Plaintiff: Dana H. Atkins
Defendant: Georgia Housing and Finance Authority
Case Number: 2:2020cv00016
Filed: February 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION to Stay Pretrial and Discovery Deadlines. (MG)
March 26, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay Pretrial and Discovery Deadlines by Georgia Housing and Finance Authority. Responses due by 4/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scott, Monika)
March 16, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Georgia Housing and Finance Authority. Responses due by 3/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Briefs Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Scott, Monika)
February 26, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Georgia Housing and Finance Authority answer due 3/16/2020. (MG)
February 26, 2020 Filing 5 Clerk's Extension of Time (LR 6.1) to Respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 02/26/2020. (MG)
February 26, 2020 Filing 4 Consent Motion for Clerks Extension of Time (LR 6.1) to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Georgia Housing and Finance Authority. Responses due by 3/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scott, Monika)
February 21, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Re-file any Pending Motions Previously Filed due by 3/6/2020. (csr)
February 21, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Georgia Housing and Finance Authority answer due 3/2/2020. (csr)
February 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to All Counsel of Record re: #2 Notice of Removal. (csr)
February 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Georgia Housing and Finance Authority from Superior Court of Glynn County, Georgia, case number CE19-01410. (Filing fee $400.00; receipt number 113J-2788392). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Emergency Petition for TRO and/or Preliminary Injunction, Notice of Non Judicial Foreclosure Sale, Quit Claim Deed, Orders, Motion to Approve Settlement, Stipulation for Settlement, Quit Claim Deed, Qualified Written Request Under the Real Estate Settlement & Procedures Act for Account Information, Letter, Summons, Complaint, Public.net, Letters, Quit Claim Deed, Structural Damage Claim Policy, Explanation of Building Replacement Cost Benefits, Order Approving Stipulation of Settlement, Purchase & Sale Agreement, Quit Claim Deed, Correspondences and Notice of Appearance, #2 Exhibit B: Notice of Filing Removal and Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet). (csr) Modified on 2/21/2020 (csr).
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 2/21/2020. (csr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atkins v. Georgia Housing and Finance Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Housing and Finance Authority
Represented By: Monika V. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana H. Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?