Smith v. Symrise, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: DS Smith
Defendant: Symrise, Inc. and Renessenz, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00019
Filed: February 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David E. Kawala. (MG)
April 23, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David E. Kawala Receipt Number AGASDC-2829176, Fee Amount $200, by Symrise, Inc.. Responses due by 5/7/2020. (Lovett, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/23/2020: #1 Supplemental List) (MG). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/24/2020: #2 Certificate of Good Standing-District Court) (MG).
March 24, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/6/2020 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. Dial-in instructions will be provided by Courtroom Deputy Clerk prior to scheduled call. (km)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 4/24/2020. Discovery due by 7/31/2020. Motions due by 12/1/2020. Pretrial Order due by 2/1/2021. Status Report due by 11/4/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 3/24/2020. (ca)
March 16, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Counterclaim by DS Smith.(Jones, Billy)
March 13, 2020 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Jones, Billy)
February 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Billy N. Jones on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jones, Billy)
February 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing by Symrise, Inc. of No Related Cases (Lovett, Robert)
February 25, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties by Symrise, Inc., pursuant to Disclosure Statement Local Rule 7.1.1. (Lovett, Robert) Modified on 2/26/2020 (csr).
February 25, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Re-File Any Pending Motions Previously Filed in State Court due by 3/10/2020. (csr)
February 25, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against DS Smith by Symrise, Inc. (Lovett, Robert) Modified on 2/26/2020 (jlh).
February 25, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Symrise, Inc. answer due 3/3/2020. Notice of Appearance due by 3/6/2020. (csr)
February 25, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to All Counsel of Record re: #1 Notice of Removal. (csr)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 2/25/2020. (csr)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Symrise, Inc. from State Court of Glynn County, Georgia, case number CV2020005. (Filing fee $400.00; receipt number: 113J-2790556). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B: Notice of Service of Process, Summons, Complaint, #2 Exhibit C: Case Summary, #3 Exhibit D: Declaration of Jens Obermueller, #4 Exhibit D-1: Delaware - State of Delaware Certificate of Merger, #5 Exhibit E: Complaint, #6 Exhibit F: Circular and Accompanying Form of Proxy, #7 Exhibit G: DS Smith History, #8 Exhibit H: Complaint, #9 Exhibit I: Defendant's Answer, #10 Exhibit J: State of Delaware, #11 Exhibit K: DS Smith Continues Expansion). (csr) Modified on 2/25/2020 (csr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Symrise, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Symrise, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Bates Lovett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renessenz, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DS Smith
Represented By: Billy N. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?