James v. Kidder et al
Plaintiff: Kewarn James
Defendant: Dr. FNU Gunderson, Dr. FNU Kidder and FNU Ductka
Case Number: 2:2020cv00028
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Kewarn James. The Court has assessed an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $9.40. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 4/15/2020. (ca)
April 13, 2020 Filing 9 Letter from Kewarn James regarding witnesses. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ca)
April 13, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT by Prisoner Kewarn James to collection of fees. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ca)
April 13, 2020 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Kewarn James. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Account Statement, #2 Envelope)(ca)
April 3, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 4/17/2020 re: #6 Deficiency Notice. (csr)
April 3, 2020 Filing 6 Deficiency Notice re: #5 Letter. Pleading is not signed. (csr)
April 3, 2020 Filing 5 Letter from Kewarn James. (Attachment: #1 Envelope). (csr)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. PLRA due by 4/23/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 3/24/2020. (ca)
March 23, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kewarn James. (Attachment: #1 Envelope). REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (csr)
March 16, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 4/6/2020 re: #2 Deficiency Notice. (csr)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 Deficiency Notice re: #1 Complaint. Filing Fee has not been paid. (csr)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kewarn James. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Envelope). (csr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. Kidder et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. FNU Gunderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. FNU Kidder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Ductka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kewarn James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?