German v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sherry German
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, Brock & Scott, PLLC and American General Finance, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00033
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Set Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/30/2020. (ca)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time regarding Stay of Proceedings for Plaintiff and Defendants to Conduct Settlement Negotiations through June 30, 2020. The parties are ORDERED to file a status report on or before June 30, 2020 informing the Court whether the parties have resolved their dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 5/14/2020. (ca)
May 7, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Stay of Proceedings for Parties to Conduct Settlement Negotiations. (ca)
May 7, 2020 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Stay of Proceedings for Parties to Conduct Settlement Negotiations , by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. Responses due by 5/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burbine, Jennifer)
April 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Lee McGhan on behalf of Sherry German (McGhan, Jennifer)
March 27, 2020 Set Deadlines: Compliance re #5 Order due by 5/15/2020. (ca)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Stay discovery and other proceedings in this case up to and including May 15, 2020. The Court DIRECTS the parties to inform the Court on or before May 15, 2020 whether they were successful in their efforts to mediate this case, at which time this stay will be automatically lifted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 3/27/2020. (ca)
March 26, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #4 Joint MOTION to Stay re #1 Notice of Removal, (to Extend the Stay of Proceedings to Conduct Settlement Negotiations). (ca)
March 26, 2020 Filing 4 Joint MOTION to Stay re #1 Notice of Removal, (to Extend the Stay of Proceedings to Conduct Settlement Negotiations) by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. Responses due by 4/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burbine, Jennifer)
March 26, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 4/9/2020. (MG)
March 26, 2020 Filing 3 REMOVAL NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. Set Deadlines: Plaintiff's Notice of Appearance due by 4/5/2020. (ca)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 3/26/2020. (ca)
March 25, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: American General Finance, Inc. answer due 3/12/2020; Brock & Scott, PLLC answer due 3/12/2020; Nationstar Mortgage, LLC answer due 3/12/2020. (ca)
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC from Superior Court of Camden County, Georgia, case number 2020-CV-171. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113J2809302). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Case Docket, Complaint, American General Finance Note, Summons, Case Filing Information Form, Acknowledgement and Waiver of Formal Service, #2 Exhibit B - qPublic.net Summary, #3 Exhibit C - Consent to Removal, #4 Notification@pay.gov, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: German v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer R. Burbine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brock & Scott, PLLC
Represented By: Kyle Shigeyuki Kotake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American General Finance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry German
Represented By: Jennifer Lee McGhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?