Woodward v. Camden County Jail et al
Plaintiff: Robert Woodward
Defendant: Camden County Jail and Officer FNU McPherson
Case Number: 2:2020cv00044
Filed: April 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2020 Filing fee payment received, Amount $50.00, Receipt BWK009554. (csr)
June 3, 2020 Filing fee payment received, Amount $35.00, Receipt BWK009553. (csr)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Robert Woodward. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 5/20/20. (slt)
May 18, 2020 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury to include relief by Robert Woodward. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ca)
May 18, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT by Prisoner Robert Woodward to collection of fees. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ca)
May 18, 2020 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Robert Woodward. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ca)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. PLRA due by 6/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 05/01/2020. (MG)
April 29, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert Woodward. Responses due by 5/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (MG)
April 29, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint. Compliance due by 5/13/2020. (MG)
April 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Robert Woodward. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Grievance Form, #2 Envelope) (MG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodward v. Camden County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Woodward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camden County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer FNU McPherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?