Dunn v. Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Robert Dunn
Defendant: Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00077
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Remand to the Superior Court of Glynn County. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 8/11/2020. (ca)
August 10, 2020 Filing 10 Consent MOTION to Remand to Superior Court of Glynn County by Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.. Responses due by 8/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit 1)(Marsh, C.)
July 29, 2020 Filing 9 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Robert Dunn. (East, Joseph) Modified on 7/30/2020 (csr).
July 29, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph E. East on behalf of Robert Dunn (East, Joseph)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Marsh, C.)
July 15, 2020 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.. (Marsh, C.)
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc..(Marsh, C.)
July 15, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc. answer due 7/22/2020. Notice of Appearance or Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice due by 7/25/2020. Re-File Motions Previously Filed in State Court due by 7/29/2020. (csr)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE To All Counsel of Record re: #1 Notice of Removal. (csr)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 7/15/2020. (csr)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc., from The Superior Court of Glynn County, State of Georgia, case number CE20-00557. (Filing fee paid on 7/15/2020 - $400; receipt number AGASDC-2881906). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Service of Process Notice, Summons, Complaint, Rule 5.2 Certificate of Service of Discovery, Interrogatories to Defendant, and Sheriff's Entry of Service, #2 Exhibit B - Business Search / Business Information, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, Notice of Removal of Action Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1441(b) (Discovery), Service of Process Notice, Sheriff's Entry of Service, Summons, Complaint for Damages, Interrogatories to Defendant, Sheriff's Entry of Service, Business Search / Business Information, Defendant Harbor Freight Tools USA Inc's Notice of Filing of Removal to Federal Court #4 Civil Cover Sheet). (csr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunn v. Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Dunn
Represented By: Joseph E. East
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.
Represented By: C. Bradford Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?