UNUM Life Insurance Company of America v. Morris et al
Plaintiff: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Melvia Morris and Jeremy Brantley
Case Number: 2:2020cv00088
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. Melvia Morris waiver sent on 8/26/2020, answer due 10/25/2020. (Bondurant, Elizabeth)
October 1, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America waiver sent on 8/26/2020, answer due 10/25/2020. (Bondurant, Elizabeth)
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Jeremy Brantley and Melvia Morris. (csr)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Submitted (Bondurant, Elizabeth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/24/2020: #1 Flattened Copy) (csr).
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Submitted (Bondurant, Elizabeth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/24/2020: #1 Flattened Copy) (csr).
August 21, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #4 MOTION to Deposit Funds. (loh)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Deposit Funds by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. Responses due by 9/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bondurant, Elizabeth)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (Bondurant, Elizabeth)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f)ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 8/20/2020. (csr)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. $400.00 Filing Fee Paid - Receipt Number: AGASDC-2907592. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet). (csr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America v. Morris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melvia Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Brantley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Bondurant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?