Chapman S.R. v. Proctor et al
Plaintiff: Trevon D. Chapman S.R.
Defendant: Mr. FNU Grant, Mr. FNU Phillips, Charles Dillio, Ronnie Mastorianni, Mr. FNU Savage, James Proctor, Eric Watson, Buck Aldridge, James Miner, Luis Vallejo and Jennie Sikes
Case Number: 2:2020cv00091
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Filing 10 Plaintiff's OBJECTION to #5 **VACATED 10/19/20** Report and Recommendations by Trevon D. Chapman S.R.. (ca) Modified on 10/21/2020 (ca).
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Trevon D. Chapman S.R. Because Plaintiff has provided the necessary forms and, thus, complied with the Court's August 27, 2020 Order, doc. #4 , I hereby VACATE the Report and Recommendation. Doc. #5 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 10/19/2020. (ca)
October 13, 2020 Filing 8 Inmate Account Statement by Trevon D. Chapman S.R. (csr)
October 13, 2020 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Trevon D. Chapman S.R. (csr)
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT by Prisoner Trevon D. Chapman S.R. to collection of fees. (csr)
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 **VACATED 10/19/20**REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the Court dismiss without prejudice #1 Complaint, direct the Clerk of Court to close this case and enter the appropriate judgment of dismissal, and deny Plaintiff in forma pauperis status on appeal. Objections to R&R due by 10/19/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 10/05/2020. (MG) Modified on 10/19/2020 (ca).
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. PLRA due by 9/28/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 08/27/2020. (MG)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 Inmate Account Statement by Trevon D. Chapman S.R. (MG)
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Trevon D. Chapman S.R.. Responses due by 9/8/2020. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (MG)
August 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Trevon D. Chapman S.R.(MG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chapman S.R. v. Proctor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. FNU Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. FNU Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Dillio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Mastorianni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. FNU Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Proctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buck Aldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Miner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Vallejo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennie Sikes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevon D. Chapman S.R.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?