DREYFUSS v. WEST COAST LIFE INS. CO.
Plaintiff: ROBERT C. DREYFUSS
Defendant: WEST COAST LIFE INS. CO.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00099
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 11, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Intent by ROBERT C. DREYFUSS re #13 Reply to Response to Motion. (Brooks, Todd)
November 11, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and MOTION to Change Venue filed by WEST COAST LIFE INS. CO.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Drum, Starr) Modified on 11/12/2020 (csr).
October 29, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Intent to File Reply by WEST COAST LIFE INS. CO. re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and MOTION to Change Venue. (Drum, Starr) Modified on 10/29/2020 (csr).
October 28, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and MOTION to Change Venue filed by ROBERT C. DREYFUSS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email, #2 Exhibit Acknowledgment of Service and Agreed Order)(Brooks, Todd) Modified on 10/29/2020 (csr).
October 14, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WEST COAST LIFE INS. CO. identifying Protective Life Insurance Company as Corporate Parent.. (Drum, Starr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/14/2020: #1 Correct Attachment) (csr).
October 14, 2020 Filing 9 Litigants' Bill of Rights by WEST COAST LIFE INS. CO.. (Drum, Starr)
October 14, 2020 Filing 8 ******* MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, MOTION to Change Venue by WEST COAST LIFE INS. CO.. Responses due by 10/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Drum, Starr)
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 Litigants' Bill of Rights by ROBERT C. DREYFUSS. (Brooks, Todd)
September 28, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: WEST COAST LIFE INS. CO. answer due 10/14/2020. (ca)
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Linda Banks on September 23, 2020, filed by ROBERT C. DREYFUSS. (Brooks, Todd)
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to WEST COAST LIFE INS. CO.(MG)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 26(f) INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 09/18/2020. (MG) Modified on 9/18/2020 (MG).
September 17, 2020 Filing 3 Litigants' Bill of Rights by ROBERT C. DREYFUSS. (MG) Modified on 9/18/2020 (MG).
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by ROBERT C. DREYFUSS. (MG) Modified on 9/18/2020 (MG).
September 17, 2020 Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number AGASDC-2926574. (MG)
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WEST COAST LIFE INS. CO., filed by ROBERT C. DREYFUSS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (MG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DREYFUSS v. WEST COAST LIFE INS. CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT C. DREYFUSS
Represented By: Todd C. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEST COAST LIFE INS. CO.
Represented By: Starr Turner Drum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?